Global Patent Index - EP 0992047 A1

EP 0992047 A1 2000-04-12 - CIRCUIT BREAKER TERMINAL SHIELD WITH INTEGRAL SECURING

Title (en)

CIRCUIT BREAKER TERMINAL SHIELD WITH INTEGRAL SECURING

Title (de)

SCHUTZSCHALTER MIT INTEGRIERTER POLABSCHIRMUNG

Title (fr)

BLINDAGE TERMINAL POUR DISJONCTEUR AVEC FIXATION MONOBLOC

Publication

EP 0992047 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98924859 A

Priority

  • US 9810552 W
  • US 88486997 A
  • US 88479397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9900810A1] A circuit breaker terminal shield with integral securing and installation and removal features apparatus means and system for use with a circuit breaker assembly (90) having at least one circuit breaker terminal (90a, b) at least one fastening aperture associated with a circuit breaker projecting end member and another circuit breaker projecting end member, the circuit breaker terminal shield apparatus having at least one terminal shield main frame member (30) having a first terminal shield fastening member adapted to fasten the terminal shield main frame member (30) to the circuit breaker projecting end member of the circuit breaker assembly (90), and further having a second terminal shield fastening member adapted to further fasten the terminal shield main frame member to the another circuit breaker projecting member of the circuit breaker assembly (90).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/0264 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9900810A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9900810 A1 19990107; DE 69810473 D1 20030206; DE 69810473 T2 20031030; EP 0992047 A1 20000412; EP 0992047 B1 20030102

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050522

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-05-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050522

2005-05-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050522

2004-07-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040719

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040525

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040506

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-08-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810473 P 20030206

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: 20030102

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS ENERGY & AUTOMATION, INC.

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020617

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GREEN, RUSSELL, B.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROBBINS, W., DALE

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SOUZA, MICHAEL, W.

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991210

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT