Global Patent Index - EP 0992049 A1

EP 0992049 A1 2000-04-12 - ELECTROMAGNETIC SWITCHING DEVICE WITH ARCING CHAMBERS

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC SWITCHING DEVICE WITH ARCING CHAMBERS

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES SCHALTGERÄT MIT LÖSCHKAMMERN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE COMMUTATION ELECTROMAGNETIQUE AVEC CHAMBRES D'EXTINCTION

Publication

EP 0992049 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99911806 A

Priority

  • DE 19814411 A
  • EP 9901875 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19814411C1] the device has switching contacts in switching chambers formed by a switching chamber housing (12), a deionisation device per switching chamber in the form of a quenching chamber (14) formed by a packet of quenching plates and a cover (13) for closing the top of the switching chambers. The uppermost quenching plate facing the cover has at least one curved strap as a screening plate for each quenching chamber and corresp. pockets are formed on the underside of the cover. The quenching chambers can be attached to the cover by inserting the straps into the pockets to form a shape-locking joint

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/345 (2013.01); H01H 9/342 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950867A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19814411 C1 19990715; AT 300095 T 20050815; CN 1121698 C 20030917; CN 1262773 A 20000809; EP 0992049 A1 20000412; EP 0992049 B1 20050720; HK 1027211 A1 20040604; JP 2000513495 A 20001010; JP 3290670 B2 20020610; US 6191377 B1 20010220; WO 9950867 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140320

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59912292

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140321

2014-11-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59912292

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130328

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130315

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130308

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130129

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-02-29 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: DTS ZUERICH;RESIRAIN 1;8125 ZOLLIKERBERG (CH)

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060320

2006-02-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-11-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DTS ZUERICH

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912292 P 20050825

2005-07-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050720

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE