Global Patent Index - EP 0992050 A1

EP 0992050 A1 2000-04-12 - HIGH VOLTAGE CIRCUIT BREAKER WITH TWO ARCING CONTACTS WHICH CAN BE ACTUATED IN AN OPPOSITE DIRECTION

Title (en)

HIGH VOLTAGE CIRCUIT BREAKER WITH TWO ARCING CONTACTS WHICH CAN BE ACTUATED IN AN OPPOSITE DIRECTION

Title (de)

HOCHSPANNUNGS-LEISTUNGSSCHALTER MIT ZWEI ENTGEGENGESETZT ANTREIBBAREN LICHTBOGENKONTAKTSTÜCKEN

Title (fr)

SECTIONNEUR DE PUISSANCE HAUTE TENSION A PIECES DE CONTACT D'ARC ACTIONNABLES DE MANIERE OPPOSEE

Publication

EP 0992050 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98942481 A

Priority

  • DE 9801822 W
  • DE 19727850 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6271494B1] A high-voltage circuit breaker is described having arcing contacts, which can be driven in opposite directions, as well as corner gears that are coupled, via a driving rod, with the driven insulating nozzle surrounding the arcing contacts, with the corner gears being designed as a lever mechanism using a two-armed control lever. The one end of the control lever is shaped like a fork, with a journal that is attached to the driving rod engaging with this end. The other end of the control lever is coupled, via a reciprocating element, with the head piece of the second arcing contact, which is driven in the opposite direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/24 (2006.01); H01H 33/915 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/245 (2013.01); H01H 33/7023 (2013.01); H01H 2033/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9900814A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

US 6271494 B1 20010807; BR 9811270 A 20000718; BR 9811270 B1 20100713; DE 19727850 C1 19980917; EP 0992050 A1 20000412; EP 0992050 B1 20020227; WO 9900814 A1 19990107

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170904

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-09-29 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: WERNER-VON-SIEMENS-STRASSE 1, 80333 MUENCHEN (DE)

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170623

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050626

2005-06-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050626

2004-06-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040604

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-02-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-08-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020425

2002-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803205 20020404

2002-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI