Global patent index - EP 0992060 A1

EP 0992060 A1 2000-04-12 - FLUORESCENT LAMP WITH LUMINESCENT MATERIAL LAYER THICKNESS ADAPTED TO THE GEOMETRICAL DISCHARGE DISTRIBUTION

Title (en)

FLUORESCENT LAMP WITH LUMINESCENT MATERIAL LAYER THICKNESS ADAPTED TO THE GEOMETRICAL DISCHARGE DISTRIBUTION

Title (de)

LEUCHTSTOFFLAMPE MIT AUF DIE GEOMETRISCHE ENTLADUNGSVERTEILUNG ABGESTIMMTER LEUCHTSTOFFSCHICHTDICKE

Title (fr)

TUBE FLUORESCENT AVEC EPAISSEUR DE COUCHE DE LA SUBSTANCE FLUORESCENTE ADAPTEE A LA REPARTITION GEOMETRIQUE DES DECHARGES

Publication

EP 0992060 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99945733 A

Priority

  • DE 9901094 W
  • DE 19817477 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19817477A1] The fluorescent lamp has a discharge vessel filled with a gas filling and has a fluorescent coating (1). It has an electrode structure (2) for a discharge that is restrained in dielectric fashion. The electrode structure establishes a geometric distribution of part-discharges (3) in the region of the lamp. The fluorescent coating has a varying coating thickness matched to the geometric distribution. The electrode structure establishes the geometric distribution by cathode projections (4) and by varying the thickness of an electrode dielectric as well as by variation of the width of the electrodes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/42; H01J 65/00; H01J 65/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/42 (2006.01); H01J 65/00 (2006.01); H01J 65/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/42 (2013.01); H01J 65/00 (2013.01); H01J 65/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954915A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19817477 A1 19991021; CA 2294315 A1 19991028; EP 0992060 A1 20000412; EP 0992060 B1 20020206; JP 2000513498 A 20001010; JP 3388546 B2 20030324; KR 100356284 B1 20021012; KR 20010020614 A 20010315; TW 434640 B 20010516; US 6340862 B1 20020122; WO 9954915 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070409

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070409

2006-06-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060619

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060425

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060411

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050409

2005-01-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-04-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030428

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-10 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030410

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-07-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020411

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900820

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-21

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010713

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991206

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL