Global Patent Index - EP 0992066 A1

EP 0992066 A1 2000-04-12 - SEMICONDUCTOR CIRCUIT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (en)

SEMICONDUCTOR CIRCUIT DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF

Title (de)

HALBLEITERSCHALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DUDIT CIRCUIT

Publication

EP 0992066 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98941230 A

Priority

  • DE 9801741 W
  • DE 19726881 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19726881A1] The invention relates to a monolithic integrated semiconductor circuit device (1), comprising a semiconductor substrate (2), in which or on which several circuit elements are configured, electrically interconnected and optionally connected to other contact points, especially those arranged on the edge of the semiconductor substrate (2), by means of conductor patterns (4, 5, 6), which are included in several contact planes (Poly-Si, M1, M2, M3), beginning with a first (poly-Si) plane which is the closest to the main surface (3) of the semiconductor substrate (2) and ranging to a final contact plane (M3). A protection facility consisting of interruptable fuses (8) or connectable anti-fuses is configured at least in sections on the basis of the conductor pattern (6) of the penultimate contact plane (M2). The invention also relates to a method for producing such monolithic integrated semiconductor circuit device (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 23/525

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 23/525 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 23/5252 (2013.01); H01L 23/5256 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0002 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

H01L 2924/0002 + H01L 2924/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9859370A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19726881 A1 19990107; EP 0992066 A1 20000412; US 6310396 B1 20011030; WO 9859370 A1 19981230

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-07 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20100427

2009-11-18 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20091123

2009-05-20 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20090401

2008-04-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: QIMONDA AG

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE