Global Patent Index - EP 0992081 A1

EP 0992081 A1 2000-04-12 - FLAT PLUG CONTACT ORGAN FOR ELECTRICAL CONNECTORS

Title (en)

FLAT PLUG CONTACT ORGAN FOR ELECTRICAL CONNECTORS

Title (de)

FLACHSTECK-KONTAKTORGAN FÜR ELEKTRISCHE STECKVERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

ORGANE DE CONTACT POUR CONNEXIONS ELECTRIQUES PAR ENFICHAGE

Publication

EP 0992081 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936198 A

Priority

  • DE 9801654 W
  • DE 19726857 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9859394A1] The invention relates to a contact organ (1) consisting of a stamped bent part (2) with a line connection element (4), a box-shaped intermediate area (Z) and a contact blade (10) protruding from said area, wherein the half blades (10a, 10b) and the roof wall (9) of the intermediate area are arranged behind each other in the winding of the stamped bent part in a longitudinal direction in line with the bottom wall (6) of the intermediate area. As a result, the space between the stamped bent parts on a metal strip is as small as possible. The contact blade (10) is formed by folding both half blades (10a, 10b) on a transversal bending line (B3) with a double material thickness, wherein the roof wall (9) extends in-between the side walls (7) of the intermediate area (Z) and a closed, highly-stable right-angled box arises.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/04; H01R 43/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/04 (2006.01); H01R 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9859394A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9859394 A1 19981230; EP 0992081 A1 20000412; EP 0992081 B1 20020417; JP 2002505031 A 20020212; KR 20010014213 A 20010226; US 6238252 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-02-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030617

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-06-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-04-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030120

2002-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS A.G.

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-09-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-07-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-07-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020531

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803864 20020523

2002-05-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020501

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020423

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2002-04-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT PT SE