Global Patent Index - EP 0992082 A1

EP 0992082 A1 2000-04-12 - FLAT PLUG CONTACT MEMBER FOR ELECTRICAL PLUG-TYPE CONNECTORS

Title (en)

FLAT PLUG CONTACT MEMBER FOR ELECTRICAL PLUG-TYPE CONNECTORS

Title (de)

FLACHSTECK-KONTAKTORGAN FÜR ELEKTRISCHE STECKVERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

ORGANE DE CONTACT PLAT ENFICHABLE POUR CONNEXIONS ELECTRIQUES ENFICHABLES

Publication

EP 0992082 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936199 A

Priority

  • DE 9801655 W
  • DE 19727266 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9900875A1] The invention relates to a contact member (1) formed from a stamped bent part (2), comprising a line connection element (4), a box-shaped intermediate area (Z) and contact blade (10) protruding therefrom. The intermediate area (Z) is configured with lugs (23-26) which are laterally spaced in the two side walls (7, 8). The size of said lugs matches the difference between the cross-section of the intermediate area and the cross-section (B) of a larger, existing contact chamber (34). The contact member has an identical configuration on both sides, can be produced by an existing machining tool and is compatible with existing contact chambers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/428

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/04 (2006.01); H01R 13/428 (2006.01); H01R 13/432 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/432 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9900875A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9900875 A1 19990107; EP 0992082 A1 20000412; EP 0992082 B1 20030219; JP 2002506559 A 20020226; KR 20010014253 A 20010226

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031120

2004-01-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS A.G.

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-08-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-08-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-05-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-05-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807255 P 20030327

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2003-02-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-02-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-02-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030219

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010314

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT PT SE