Global Patent Index - EP 0992096 A1

EP 0992096 A1 2000-04-12 - OVERVOLTAGE PROTECTION MAGAZINE FOR A DEVICE USED IN TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENGINEERING

Title (en)

OVERVOLTAGE PROTECTION MAGAZINE FOR A DEVICE USED IN TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENGINEERING

Title (de)

ÜBERSPANNUNGSSCHUTZMAGAZIN FÜR EINE EINRICHTUNG DER TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSTECHNIK

Title (fr)

CHASSIS LIMITEUR DE TENSION POUR DISPOSITIF UTILISE DANS LA TECHNIQUE DES TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Publication

EP 0992096 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99922105 A

Priority

  • DE 19818477 A
  • EP 9902621 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19818477A1] Provides conductor for removing overvoltages. The rack has a housing which provides slots and connections to a conductor for removing high voltages, with an earth rail.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01T 4/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01T 4/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 4/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9956361A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19818477 A1 19991028; AU 3927499 A 19991116; AU 755266 B2 20021205; EP 0992096 A1 20000412; EP 0992096 B1 20020724; PL 197508 B1 20080430; PL 337607 A1 20000828; WO 9956361 A1 19991104; ZA 9907684 B 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160419

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160419

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150415

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070419

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050418

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-04-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030422

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-09-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI

2002-07-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001002

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH FR GB IT LI