Global Patent Index - EP 0992200 A1

EP 0992200 A1 2000-04-12 - Automatic footwear parts processing machine

Title (en)

Automatic footwear parts processing machine

Title (de)

Automatische Bearbeitungsmaschine für Schuhteile

Title (fr)

Machine automatique de traitement des parties de chaussures

Publication

EP 0992200 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99203106 A

Priority

IT MI982083 A

Abstract (en)

A footwear parts processing machine comprises a powered head (11) served by a first carriage (13) supporting a footwear part, a powered head (12) served by a second carriage (14) supporting a footwear part and a powered device (15) for transfer of a footwear part from one of said carriages at an unloading position. Advantageously the two heads (11,12) are side-by-side and the respective carriages (13,14) run along parallel guides (24,25) to each move between a working position (26,27) opposite the respective head and a transfer position (28,29) opposite the transfer device (15) and in its unloading position the transfer device unloads the footwear part in one of said carriages. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43D 111/00; A43D 25/18; A43D 37/00; A43D 119/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43D 25/18 (2006.01); A43D 37/00 (2006.01); A43D 111/00 (2006.01); A43D 119/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43D 119/00 (2013.01); A43D 25/18 (2013.01); A43D 37/00 (2013.01); A43D 111/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992200 A1 20000412; IT 1302283 B1 20000905; IT MI982083 A1 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030110

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001010;LT PAYMENT 20001010;LV PAYMENT 20001010;MK PAYMENT 20001010;RO PAYMENT 20001010;SI PAYMENT 20001010

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI