Global Patent Index - EP 0992202 A2

EP 0992202 A2 2000-04-12 - Hair curler

Title (en)

Hair curler

Title (de)

Lockenwickler zum Aufwickeln menschlichen Haares

Title (fr)

Bigoudi

Publication

EP 0992202 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119495 A

Priority

DE 19845924 A

Abstract (en)

The roller has a hollow metal or plastic support body (2) and an outer covering (5). The cover is a strip (4) of brush material comprising a carrier layer (7) with projecting bristles (8) of 4-7 mm length. The bristles are at an angle of ca. 50-70 degrees to the tangential circumferential direction of the support body. The bristles are inclined and overlap each other in an X-formation. The strip has surface-active cationic and amphotonic ingredients to render it anti-static.

Abstract (de)

Ein Lockenwickler (1) zum Aufwickeln menschlichen Haares weist einen Stützkörper (2) aus einem hohlen gestaltgebenden Formteil aus Kunststoff oder Metall und einen den Umfang des Stützkörpers (2) im wesentlichen bedeckenden Belag (5) auf. Der Belag (5) besteht aus einem Streifen (4) eines Bürstenmaterials aus einer Tragschicht (7) mit darauf angeordneten abstehenden Borsten (8), die in einem Winkelbereich zwischen etwa 50 bis 70° schrägstehend zur tangentialen Umfangsrichtung des Stützkörpers (2) angeordnet sind, wobei jede Borste (8) eine Länge zwischen etwa 4 und 7 mm aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 2/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 2/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 2/2471 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992202 A2 20000412; EP 0992202 A3 20020904; DE 19845924 C1 20000420; TR 9902453 A2 20000522

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 45D 2/12 A, 7A 45D 2/24 B

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI