Global patent index - EP 0992228 A2

EP 0992228 A2 2000-04-12 - Apparatus for adjustably reducing the weight applied by a person on the ground

Title (en)

Apparatus for adjustably reducing the weight applied by a person on the ground

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur veränderbaren Verringerung des von einer Person auf den Boden ausgeübten Gewichts

Title (fr)

Appareil pour la réduction du poids exercé par une personne sur le sol

Publication

EP 0992228 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119490 A

Priority

DE 19845589 A

Abstract (en)

The system includes a ceiling-mounted, or column-mounted deck (11). A limb support and positioning system is connected in the form of a continuously adjustable double boom. The height and lateral displacement of the booms can be controlled individually or in parallel, using a transmitter electrically connected to the deck. The control may be by remote controller. A treadmill may also be provided.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur veränderbaren Verringerung des von einer Person auf den Boden ausgeübten Gewichts, insbesondere einer behinderten Person. Die Vorrichtung weist ein Versorgungsdeck auf, welches mit einem Personen-Halte- und Stellsystem verbunden ist, wobei das Versorgungsdeck als Deckengerät oder als verfahrbare Ständeranlage ausgebildet ist. Das Personen-Halte- und Stellsystem zur Anpassung an den Patienten ist als stufenlos verstellbarer Doppelausleger ausgebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 3/00; A61H 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/10 (2006.01); A61H 3/00 (2006.01); A61G 7/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/1017 (2013.01); A61G 7/1044 (2013.01); A61G 7/1046 (2013.01); A61G 7/108 (2013.01); A61H 3/008 (2013.01); A61H 2201/0192 (2013.01); A61H 2201/1635 (2013.01); A61H 2201/5061 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19845589 A1 20000406; DE 19845589 B4 20070531; EP 0992228 A2 20000412; EP 0992228 A3 20020306; IL 132190 D0 20010319; NO 994833 A 20000406; NO 994833 D0 19991004

INPADOC legal status

2005-07-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050113

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030411

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020912

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI