Global Patent Index - EP 0992230 A2

EP 0992230 A2 2000-04-12 - Medical pumping apparatus and related methods

Title (en)

Medical pumping apparatus and related methods

Title (de)

Medizinische Pumpenvorrichtung und zugehörigem Verfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif de pompage médical et procédés associés

Publication

EP 0992230 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99307963 A

Priority

US 16859798 A

Abstract (en)

A medical pumping system (10) for use with a therapeutic patient treatment system generally comprises a reservoir (12) for holding a compressed fluid, with a fluid outlet (13,14) and a valve (15,16) for controlling flow of fluid from the reservoir through the outlet; a compressor (11) for supplying pressurised fluid to the reservoir (12); and a controller (17) for controlling the supply of pressurised fluid to the reservoir (12) and for controlling the flow of fluid from the reservoir through the outlet (13,14). The controller (17) has associated therewith a sensor (25) for measuring the internal pressure of the reservoir, and is adapted to provide the reservoir with an initial quantity of fluid on an initial cycle of operation; to operate the valve (15,16) to release the initial quantity of fluid from the reservoir (12) through the valve; to measure the internal pressure of the reservoir (12) while the valve (15,16) is operated; and to provide the reservoir with an additional quantity of fluid, less than the initial quantity of fluid based upon a comparison of the internal pressure of the reservoir (Peq), after the release of the initial quantity of fluid, with the target pressure (Ptarg). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 9/0078 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • US 3957493 A 19760518
  • US 10391098 A

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992230 A2 20000412; EP 0992230 A3 20010822

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040113

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020222

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61H 23/04 A, 7A 61F 5/34 B, 7F 04B 49/02 B, 7F 04D 27/02 B, 7G 05D 16/20 B

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TUMEY, DAVID M.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RANDOLPH, TAB L.

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI