Global Patent Index - EP 0992278 A1

EP 0992278 A1 2000-04-12 - Process and apparatus for preparing a solution of at least one powder product in a liquid

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for preparing a solution of at least one powder product in a liquid

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Vorbereitung einer Lösung mindestens eines Pulverproduktes in einer Flüssigkeit

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif permettant de préparer une solution d'au moins un produit en poudre dans un fluide liquide

Publication

EP 0992278 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99390019 A

Priority

  • CA 2292011 A
  • FR 9812442 A

Abstract (en)

The powder is dissolved in a dissolving fluid in a dissolving volume (13) to form an intermediate fluid. A known quantity of the intermediate solution is transferred to a mixing volume (1) with a given quantity of the liquid to obtain a primary mixture. The mixture is circulated in a ring (100) to produce a final mixture and transferred to a user volume (24) as the required solution The ring circuit (100) has a mixing volume (1) with three inlets (2, 3, 4); a first pipe (5) connecting the first two inlets (2, 3); a first control valve (6) mounted in the first pipe upstream of the first inlet and a first volumetric pump (7) in the same pipe. The dissolving liquid feed circuit (200) has a source (8) providing the liquid to an outlet (9); a second pipe (10) connecting the outlet to a point (11) on the first pipe between the control valve and the second inlet, and a second control valve (12) mounted in the second pipe. The powder feed circuit (300) has a source (13) providing the powder to an outlet (14); a third pipe (15) connecting the outlet to a second point (16) on the first pipe between the first control valve and the second inlet, and a second volumetric pump (17) and a third control valve (18) in series in the third pipe. The liquid feed circuit (400) has a source (19) providing the liquid to an outlet (20); a fourth pipe (21) connecting the outlet to the third inlet into the mixing volume, and a third volumetric pump (22) and a fourth control valve (23) in series in the fourth pipe. The user circuit (500) has a user volume (24) containing the obtained solution, with a feed inlet (25); a fifth pipe (26) connecting a third point (27) on the first pipe to the inlet to the user volume, the third point being between the first control valve and the second inlet to the mixing volume, and a fifth control valve (28) mounted in the fifth pipe. The device also contains means of producing a signal representing the concentration of product dissolved in the solution in the third pipe, in particular using a measure of conductivity. A second signal indicates the temperature of dissolution.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne les procédés et les dispositifs permettant de préparer une solution d'au moins un produit en poudre dans un fluide liquide. Le procédé et le dispositif selon l'invention se caractérisent essentiellement par le fait que dans une première phase, une quantité déterminée de produit en poudre est dissoute dans un volume de dissolution 13 au moyen d'un liquide de dissolution provenant d'une source 8 pour obtenir une solution intermédiaire, dans une deuxième phase, une quantité déterminée de la solution intermédiaire est introduite dans un volume de mélange 1 au moyen d'une pompe volumétrique 17, avec une quantité donnée du fluide liquide par la pompe 22 pour obtenir un mélange primaire de la solution intermédiaire et du fluide liquide, dans une troisième phase, le mélange primaire est mis en circulation dans un circuit en boucle 100 pour obtenir un mélange final, et dans une quatrième phase, au moins une partie du mélange final est dérivé vers un volume d'utilisation 24, cette partie de mélange final dérivée constituant la solution à obtenir. Application, notamment, à la préparation de solutions pour la réalisation de dialyses. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 1/0038 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992278 A1 20000412; CA 2292011 A1 20010609; FR 2784039 A1 20000407; FR 2784039 B1 20001229

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030401

2001-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011005

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI