Global Patent Index - EP 0992287 A3

EP 0992287 A3 2001-03-14 - Device for taking and retaining a material to be analysed

Title (en)

Device for taking and retaining a material to be analysed

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Aufnahme und Aufbewahrung einer Substanz für eine Analyse

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour prelever et conserver un matériau à analyser

Publication

EP 0992287 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99119912 A

Priority

DE 19846466 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0992287A2] A device (A) for the uptake and storage of a substance for analysis, is new and comprises a sample uptake apparatus (I) attached to a removal apparatus (II) which has a removal capillary that allows the sample to flow through it for later analysis. (I) and (II) are positioned in or on a storage vessel (III). An Independent claim is also included for a device (B), comprising (A) for the analysis of a substance, comprising: (1) the device (A); (2) a reaction apparatus, comprising separate capillaries or absorbant materials connected to (II) through which the substance flows optionally under a pump action and containing at least one reagent; and (3) a detection apparatus with at least one detector able to detect the concentration of the reaction products and an analysis part which is dependent upon the detection of the substance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01L 3/00; A61B 5/15; G01N 33/487; G01N 33/49

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/155 (2006.01); B01L 3/00 (2006.01); G01N 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/5027 (2013.01); A61B 5/14503 (2013.01); A61B 5/150022 (2013.01); A61B 5/150358 (2013.01); A61B 5/150755 (2013.01); A61B 5/157 (2013.01); A61B 2562/028 (2013.01); B01L 3/502715 (2013.01); B01L 2200/04 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0816 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0864 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0406 (2013.01); G01N 35/1095 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992287 A2 20000412; EP 0992287 A3 20010314; DE 19846466 A1 20000427

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010915

2002-01-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI