Global Patent Index - EP 0992288 A2

EP 0992288 A2 2000-04-12 - Pipette tip ejection arrangement

Title (en)

Pipette tip ejection arrangement

Title (de)

Pipettenspitzenabwurfeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Mechanique d'éjection d'embouts de pipette

Publication

EP 0992288 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114892 A

Priority

DE 19845950 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19845950C1] The pipette unit has an ejection mechanism to detach the pipette tip from its mounting with an axial movement. The ejection system (10,11) and the ejection unit (13) have end sections which grip over each other. The pulling drive (12') has a deflection roller (28) at an end section of the ejection unit (13), with one end in a fixed position in relation to the pipette tip mounting and the other end at the ejection drive (10).

Abstract (de)

Pipettiersystem mit einer Pipettiervorrichtung und mindestens einer daran lösbar befestigten Pipettenspitze, mindestens einem Befestigungselement an der Pipettiervorrichtung, an dem die Pipettenspitze befestigt ist, einer Abwurfeinrichtung an der Pipettiervorrichtung, die ein axial bewegliches Abwurfelement zum Lösen der Pipettenspitze vom Befestigungselement bei einer Axialbewegung des Abwurfelementes und eine Antriebseinrichtung zum Antreiben der Axialbewegung des Abwurfelementes hat, und einem eine im wesentlichen axiale Antriebsbewegung der Antriebseinrichtung in eine Axialbewegung des Abwurfelementes übertragenden Zugmittel-Getriebe, Druckmittel-Getriebe oder Gelenk-Getriebe mit dem die Abwurfstange zumindest beim Lösen der Pipettenspitze vom Befestigungselement über einen geringeren Weg axial bewegbar ist als die im wesentlichen axiale Antriebsbewegung zurücklegt und eine die Kraft für die im wesentlichen axiale Antriebsbewegung übersteigende Abwurfkraft auf die Pipettenspitze ausübbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01L 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/0279 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FI FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19845950 C1 20000323; DE 59914234 D1 20070419; EP 0992288 A2 20000412; EP 0992288 A3 20020703; EP 0992288 B1 20070307; JP 2000107613 A 20000418; JP 4484985 B2 20100616; US 6199435 B1 20010313

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071210

2007-09-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-06-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070604

2007-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914234 P 20070419

2007-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB LI

2007-03-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FI FR GB LI

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020712

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EPPENDORF AG

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI