Global Patent Index - EP 0992293 A1

EP 0992293 A1 2000-04-12 - Screen, more particularly wobbling screen

Title (en)

Screen, more particularly wobbling screen

Title (de)

Siebmaschine, insbesondere Taumelsiebmaschine

Title (fr)

Tamis, en particulier tamis à vacillement

Publication

EP 0992293 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99119750 A

Priority

DE 19846043 A

Abstract (en)

The sifting device has a cylindrical housing (1) containing at least one circular sieve (2), for sorting the loose material delivered via an input on one side of the sieve. The latter has different ring segments (2.1.1,2.1.2) with different characterstics for separation of the loose material into coarse medium and fine components which are delivered via respective outputs (1.3,1.4,1.5).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung in Rundbauweise zum Klassieren oder zum Sortieren von Gut, insbesondere Taumelsiebmaschine; mit einem Gehäuse (1); mit wenigstens einem Sieb (2.1) zum Kassieren bzw. Sortieren; mit einem Einlaß für das zu siebende Gut; mit wenigstens jeweils einem Auslaß für das gesiebte Gut (Grobgut, Mittelgut, Feingut). Die Erfindung ist gekennzeichnet durch die folgenden Merkmale: wenigstens eines der Siebe weist Bereiche (2.1.1,2.1.2) unterschiedlicher Klassier- bzw. Sortiereigenschatten auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 1/06; B07B 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/06 (2006.01); B07B 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/06 (2013.01); B07B 1/288 (2013.01); B07B 1/54 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992293 A1 20000412; EP 0992293 B1 20030709; DE 19846043 A1 20000420; DE 19846043 C2 20020124

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALLGAIER WERKE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-10-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALLGAIER WERKE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-01-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031028

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031022

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE FR IT

2003-05-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-04-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE FR IT

2003-03-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALLGAIER WERKE GMBH

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020617

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR IT

2000-10-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALLGAIER-WERKE GMBH

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI