Global Patent Index - EP 0992299 A1

EP 0992299 A1 2000-04-12 - Process for producing steel

Title (en)

Process for producing steel

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erzeugung von Stahl

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d' acier

Publication

EP 0992299 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99250167 A

Priority

DE 19847271 A

Abstract (en)

On tapping into the casting pan and/or on pan treatment with intensive bath rinsing, lime, MgO, dolomite or fluorspar is added as slag former. CaO, MgO or silicic acid as the three main components have the following weight ratios in the casting pan slag: CaO/MgO = 9.0-2.4, and (CaO + MgO)/SiO2. Steel having a carbon content of not more than 0.9 wt.% and a silicon content of 0.15-1.0 wt.% is produced by: bessemerizing pig iron to steel in a basic convertor in a one-stage LD process; slag-free tapping into the casting pan; alloying and deoxidizing with Si, C and Mn without the addition of Al; fine alloying; silicon deoxidizing; and continuously casting the steel. On tapping into the casting pan and/or on pan treatment with intensive bath rinsing, lime, MgO, dolomite or fluorspar is added as slag former. CaO, MgO or silicic acid as the three main components have the following weight ratios in the casting pan slag: CaO/MgO = 9.0-2.4, and (CaO + MgO)/SiO2.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Erzeugung von Stahl mit einem Kohlenstoffgehalt gleich/kleiner 0,9 Gewichtsprozent und einem Si-Gehalt von 0,15 - 1,0 Gewichtsprozent mit den Arbeitsschritten Verblasen von Roheisen zu Stahl im basischen Konverter im einstufigen LD-Prozeß, schlackefreies Abstechen in die Gießpfanne, Legieren und Desoxidation nur mit Si, C und Mn ohne Zugabe von Al, Feinlegieren, Silizium-Desoxidation Abgießen des Stahles als Strangguß. Dabei wird beim Abstich in die Gießpfanne und / oder bei der Pfannenbehandlung bei intensiver Badspülung ein Kieselsäure-abbindendes Mittel als Schlackenbildner zugegeben.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 1/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 1/00 (2013.01); B22D 11/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992299 A1 20000412; EP 0992299 B1 20030226; AT 233142 T 20030315; DE 19847271 C1 20000504

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080527

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080425

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080527

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080527

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080527

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MANNESMANNROHREN-WERKE A.G.

- Effective date: 20080531

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070515

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070514

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-11 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904362 P 20030403

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB LU NL

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANNESMANNROEHREN-WERKE AG

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 22D 11/10 A

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE FR GB LU NL

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB LU NL

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI