Global patent index - EP 0992323 A2

EP 0992323 A2 2000-04-12 - Method for removing sand from castings

Title (en)

Method for removing sand from castings

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Entsanden von Gussstücken

Title (fr)

Procédé pour dessabler des pièces moulées

Publication

EP 0992323 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118749 A

Priority

DE 19845899 A

Abstract (en)

The compressed air-sand mixture is bunched to form at least one cutting jet, which is applied directly to the sand mold. The cutting jet can be point-form, linear to strip-shaped with the jet and the cast piece (9) moving relatively to each other. Several cutting jets are applied simultaneously to the surface of the sand mold. Where multiple compartment molds are used with cast pieces embedded spaced apart in the mold sand the cutting jets are directed to the intermediate spaces between the cast pieces.

Abstract (de)

Zum Entsanden von in Formsand abgegossenen Gußstücken mittels wenigstens eines auf die Sandform wirkenden Fluid-Druckimpulses wird das Fluid zu wenigstens einem Schneidstrahl gebündelt und diesen unmittelbar an der Sandform zur Wirkung gebracht wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24C 1/00; B24C 3/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 29/00 (2006.01); B24C 1/00 (2006.01); B24C 3/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24C 1/00 (2013.01); B24C 3/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992323 A2 20000412; EP 0992323 A3 20021127; CN 1249971 A 20000412; DE 19845899 A1 20000413; JP 2000107855 A 20000418; KR 20000028748 A 20000525; US 6283831 B1 20010904

INPADOC legal status

2004-08-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040221

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI