Global Patent Index - EP 0992323 A3

EP 0992323 A3 2002-11-27 - Method for removing sand from castings

Title (en)

Method for removing sand from castings

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Entsanden von Gussstücken

Title (fr)

Procédé pour dessabler des pièces moulées

Publication

EP 0992323 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99118749 A

Priority

DE 19845899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0992323A2] The compressed air-sand mixture is bunched to form at least one cutting jet, which is applied directly to the sand mold. The cutting jet can be point-form, linear to strip-shaped with the jet and the cast piece (9) moving relatively to each other. Several cutting jets are applied simultaneously to the surface of the sand mold. Where multiple compartment molds are used with cast pieces embedded spaced apart in the mold sand the cutting jets are directed to the intermediate spaces between the cast pieces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24C 1/00; B24C 3/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 29/00 (2006.01); B24C 1/00 (2006.01); B24C 3/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24C 1/00 (2013.01); B24C 3/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] US 4303453 A 19811201 - JUNG WERNER, et al
  • [YA] US 3738415 A 19730612 - PLANTEN J
  • [A] DE 3204162 A1 19821111 - ELSTERBERG WAERMEGERAETE [DD]
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 100 (M - 376) 2 May 1985 (1985-05-02)
  • [DXA] AMBOS E UND BEIER H-M: "Stand und Entwicklungstendenzen der Nachbehandlung von Gußstücken", GIESSEREITECHNIK, 34. JAHRGANG, no. 2, 1988, XP002211671

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992323 A2 20000412; EP 0992323 A3 20021127; CN 1249971 A 20000412; DE 19845899 A1 20000413; JP 2000107855 A 20000418; KR 20000028748 A 20000525; US 6283831 B1 20010904

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040221

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI