Global Patent Index - EP 0992326 A3

EP 0992326 A3 2000-04-26 - Wear element for a chipper with a rotary cutter ring

Title (en)

Wear element for a chipper with a rotary cutter ring

Title (de)

Verschleisselement für Zerkleinerungsmachinen mit rotierendem Messerkranz

Title (fr)

Elément d'usure pour déchiqueteuse à couronne rotative

Publication

EP 0992326 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99118859 A

Priority

DE 29817914 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2285147A1] Aa wearing element for a comminuting machine whose rotating knife head includes a support disc, a support ring arranged coaxially to the support disc and knife carriers which are distributed uniformly over the circumference and are arranged axially between the support disc and the support ring. The wearing element is composed of a plate having a certain thickness and the shape of a ring sector. The plate covers the inner periphery of the outer side of the support ring and has in the area of the gap between two knife carriers an inclined surface extending over the thickness of the wearing element toward the support ring. A wearing lip for protecting the support ring is arranged so as to extend or elongate the inclined surface portion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27L 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] US 5485873 A 19960123 - CRAMMOND PATRICK J [CA]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29817914 U1 19981210; CA 2285147 A1 20000407; CA 2285147 C 20031230; EP 0992326 A2 20000412; EP 0992326 A3 20000426; EP 0992326 B1 20030305; US 6264124 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170925

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-09-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-09-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE FI FR IT

2003-03-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE FI FR IT

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000610

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE FI FR IT

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI