Global patent index - EP 0992346 A1

EP 0992346 A1 2000-04-12 - Damping unit for an offset printing machine

Title (en)

Damping unit for an offset printing machine

Title (de)

Feuchtwerk für eine Offsetdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mouillage pour une machine à imprimer en offset

Publication

EP 0992346 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118725 A

Priority

DE 19853362 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19853362C1] The wetting feed for an offset printing press has a doctor roller (6) with a liquid feed mounted in the axial direction and with multiple spray nozzles mounted along the roller length. The liquid is fed along the feed and sprayed onto the roller.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird ein Feuchtwerk in einer Offsetdruckmaschine. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, ein Feuchtwerk zu schaffen, das eine stabile Feuchtmittelführung im Walzenzug gewährleistet und das Ablagern von Farbpartikeln auf einer Walzenoberfläche vermeidet. Gelöst wird das dadurch, indem dem Feuchtduktor 6 wenigstens ein erstes Zuführsystem 13 für Feuchtmittel in Achsrichtung zugeordnet ist, welches in Walzenlänge eine Mehrzahl von Sprühdüsen aufweist. Das Zuführsystem 13 ist mit Feuchtmittel beaufschlagbar und die Walzenoberfläche des Feuchtduktors 6 ist mit Feuchtmittel anströmbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19853362 C1 20000203; DE 19853362 C5 20040304; AT 227216 T 20021115; EP 0992346 A1 20000412; EP 0992346 B1 20021106

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59903303

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59903303

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59903303

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120510

2005-09-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050922

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-05-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030922

2004-05-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030923

2003-09-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-09-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-09-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-09-22 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

- Ref Document Number: 0992346E

- Country of Ref Document: IE

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-02-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030206

2003-02-06 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030206

2003-01-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903303

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-12

2002-11-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 227216

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010709

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI