Global Patent Index - EP 0992356 A1

EP 0992356 A1 2000-04-12 - Printing device

Title (en)

Printing device

Title (de)

Druckwerk

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'impression

Publication

EP 0992356 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99110852 A

Priority

DE 19845677 A

Abstract (en)

The mechanism has a housing with a movably mounted adjustment shaft (42) with axially spaced-apart recesses (56). The shaft is enclosed in a sleeve (28) having a locking finger (54) which engages in one of the recesses to define the axial position of the adjustment shaft. The sleeve and the locking finger are formed in two pieces. Several adjustment wheels (16) are provided on the sleeve for moving print type carriers. The adjustment shaft selectively cooperates with the adjustment wheels. The locking finger may be metal, and the sleeve plastics.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Druckwerk (10), mit einem Gehäuse, einer axial im Gehäuse verschiebbar gelagerten Einstellwelle (42) mit in axialer Richtung der Einstellwelle (42) voneinander beabstandeten Ausnehmungen (56), einer die Einstellwelle (42) umschließenden Hülse (28), wobei die Hülse (28) mit einem Rastfinger (54) versehen ist, der zur Definition der axialen Position der Einstellwelle (42) in jeweils einer der Ausnehmungen (56) der Einstellwelle (42) verrastbar ist. Um die Stabilität und Lebensdauer des Druckwerks zu verbessern, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Hülse (28) und der Rastfinger (54) zweistückig ausgeführt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41K 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41K 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41K 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19845677 A1 20000406; EP 0992356 A1 20000412; EP 0992356 B1 20030910

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120607

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906933

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120607

2013-01-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59906933

- Representative's name: SCHUMACHER & WILLSAU PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110629

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110628

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110629

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906933 P 20031016

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI