Global Patent Index - EP 0992363 A1

EP 0992363 A1 2000-04-12 - Heat-sensitive recording material

Title (en)

Heat-sensitive recording material

Title (de)

Wärmeempfindliches Aufzeichnungsmaterial

Title (fr)

Matériau d'enregistrement sensible à la chaleur

Publication

EP 0992363 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99307836 A

Priority

JP 28757398 A

Abstract (en)

A heat-sensitive recording material comprises a support having formed thereon one or more heat-sensitive recording layers, wherein the one or more heat-sensitive recording layers include an electron donative colorless dye, an electron acceptive compound and an ultraviolet ray absorbing agent, and a distribution of the ultraviolet ray absorbing agent is such that an amount of the agent increases in a film thickness direction away from the support.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/40; B41M 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/28 (2006.01); B41M 5/30 (2006.01); B41M 5/337 (2006.01); B41M 5/40 (2006.01); B41M 5/46 (2006.01); B41M 5/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/46 (2013.01); B41M 5/3375 (2013.01); B41M 5/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992363 A1 20000412; EP 0992363 B1 20040922; DE 69920361 D1 20041028; DE 69920361 T2 20050217; ES 2230809 T3 20050501; JP 2000108519 A 20000418; JP 4156724 B2 20080924

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101026

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-12-15 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-12-15 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090910

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-09-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2007-09-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-05-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FUJIFILM CORPORATION

2007-04-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MITSUBISHI HITEC PAPER FLENSBURG GMBH

- Effective date: 20050622

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2230809 T3

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69920361 P 20041028

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011011

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI