Global Patent Index - EP 0992364 A2

EP 0992364 A2 2000-04-12 - Heat-sensitive recording material

Title (en)

Heat-sensitive recording material

Title (de)

Wärmeempfindliches Aufzeichnungsmaterial

Title (fr)

Matériau d'enregistrement sensible à la chaleur

Publication

EP 0992364 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99307934 A

Priority

JP 28757098 A

Abstract (en)

In a heat-sensitive recording material including on a support thereof a heat-sensitive color developing layer containing an electron donative colorless dye and an electron acceptive compound, a first intermediate layer, whose main components are an inorganic pigment and a binder, and a second intermediate layer on the first intermediate layer, which second intermediate layer having an inorganic pigment and a binder as main components, are sequentially laminated between the support and the heat-sensitive color developing layer, such that Oken type smoothness of the first intermediate layer is not less than 700 seconds, and density of the second intermediate layer is not more than 1.0.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/28 (2006.01); B41M 5/30 (2006.01); B41M 5/337 (2006.01); B41M 5/42 (2006.01); B41M 5/40 (2006.01); B41M 5/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/42 (2013.01); B41M 5/426 (2013.01); B41M 5/44 (2013.01); B41M 2205/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992364 A2 20000412; EP 0992364 A3 20030102; EP 0992364 B1 20050112; DE 69923133 D1 20050217; DE 69923133 T2 20050616; ES 2237048 T3 20050716; JP 2000108518 A 20000418; JP 3739947 B2 20060125

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121009

2014-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140116

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69923133

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121008

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121008

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111021

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111103

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101006

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-09-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2007-09-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-12-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2237048 T3

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69923133 P 20050217

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2005-01-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030620

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI