Global Patent Index - EP 0992432 A1

EP 0992432 A1 2000-04-12 - Newspaper distribution method, newspaper distribution system, and assembly type box for newspaper distributions

Title (en)

Newspaper distribution method, newspaper distribution system, and assembly type box for newspaper distributions

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zur Verteilung von Zeitungen, und zusammenstellbare Kasten dafür

Title (fr)

Procédé et système de distribution de journaux, et boîte assemblable pour la distribution de journaux

Publication

EP 0992432 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99119909 A

Priority

JP 30333198 A

Abstract (en)

To establish a newspaper distribution system which incorporates no consumable at the time of distributing newspapers thereby to eliminate the fear of break of a naked stack of newspapers or the collapse of a packaged stack. A newspaper distribution system 10 comprises an assembly type box 13 capable of being assembled/developed a plurality of times; an automatic assembler 12 for assembling a box 13 in a developed state; a newspaper loader 17 for loading the assembled box 13 with a desired number of newspapers 18; an information display 25 arranged on the surface of the box 13 and capable of erasing/printing information a plurality of times; an address printer 24 for printing the surface of the information display 25 with information necessary for transferring the box 13; and means for sorting and transporting the box 13 to a necessary truck gate. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 25/14; B65D 6/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 6/18 (2006.01); B65B 25/14 (2006.01); B65G 47/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/141 (2013.01); B65D 11/1833 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992432 A1 20000412; JP 2000118691 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-04-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: NEWSPAPER DISTRIBUTION METHOD AND NEWSPAPER DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020204

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE DK LI SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK LI SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI