Global Patent Index - EP 0992435 A1

EP 0992435 A1 2000-04-12 - Folding box for elongate articles

Title (en)

Folding box for elongate articles

Title (de)

Faltschachtel zur Aufnahme eines stabförmigen Gegenstandes

Title (fr)

Boîte pliable pour articles de forme allongée

Publication

EP 0992435 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99119491 A

Priority

DE 29818099 U

Abstract (en)

The folding box has inserts each consisting of a retaining flap(7) extending out from a side panel(6) and which in the box's body runs at an angle from the side panel in the direction of the bottom panel(2) to which the said side panel is attached. The side panels are glued to folding flaps(11) attached to the two adjoining body panels. The opening in each retaining flap is circumscribed by a U-form cut(9), whereby the middle and curved sides of this cut run adjacent to the bottom panel to which the retaining flap is glued.

Abstract (de)

Faltschachtel als Verpackung für stabförmige Gegenstände(Halogensoffitte): vier längliche Rumpffelder bilden einstückigen Zuschnitt; zwei in der Faltschachtel einander gegenüberliegende Einsätze bilden Haltelaschen mit Durchbruch zum Abstützen der Enden der Lp; Haltelaschen sind jeweils mittels Klebelasche mit Bodenfeld verklebt; Einsätze bestehen jeweils aus einer vom Seitenfeld (6) ausgehenden Haltelasche (7), die im Rumpf schräg von dem Seitenfeld (6) in Richtung auf das Bodenfeld (2) verläuft; die Seitenfelder (6) sind mit den an beiden benachbarten Rumpffeldern (1, 3) angebrachten Faltklappen verklebt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/50; B65D 5/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/50 (2006.01); B65D 5/66 (2006.01); B65D 85/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/5021 (2013.01); B65D 5/5004 (2013.01); B65D 5/665 (2013.01); B65D 85/42 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4024112 A1 19920206 - LANDERER GMBH & CO KG A [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29818099 U1 20000210; CA 2285750 A1 20000409; CN 2405873 Y 20001115; EP 0992435 A1 20000412; EP 0992435 B1 20030604; JP 3068016 U 20000421; US 6105759 A 20000822

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905811

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-04-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-10-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59905811

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120911

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM AG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59905811

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121010

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121002

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120917

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59905811

- Effective date: 20111130

2007-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2005-12-09 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051209

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905811 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SERVOPATENT GMBH

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020205

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI