Global patent index - EP 0992437 A1

EP 0992437 A1 2000-04-12 - Dynamically balanced packaged object

Title (en)

Dynamically balanced packaged object

Title (de)

Verpackter rotationssymmetrischer Körper

Title (fr)

Objet à symétrie de révolution emballé

Publication

EP 0992437 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99119723 A

Priority

DE 19846139 A

Abstract (en)

The packaging has a linear part for its removal with increased linear tear strength, e.g. a tear-off strip or thread. It consists of woven material, netting, non-woven material, and esp. a foil. The tear-off strip is located along a jacket line of the packaging. It is sewn-in, or it is a welded strip with higher tear strength than the rest of the packaging. The foil is perforated in the jacket part of the packaging, but not in the end sections. The contents is cylindrical and consists of yarn bobbins.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein in eine flächige Verpackung verpackter rotationssymmetrischer Körper, insbesondere eine in eine perforierte Folie verpackte Garnaufmachung beschrieben, der einen zur Entfernung der Verpackung dienenden linearen Teil der Verpackung mit einer gegenüber seiner Umgebung höheren Reißkraft in Form eines Aufreißstreifens bzw. Aufreißfadens (3) aufweist. Der Streifen bzw. der Faden (3) ist bevorzugt längs der Mantellinie der Verpackung angebracht. Eine als Verpackung dienende Folie weist vorzugsweise an der Mantelfläche (2) eine durchgehende Perforierung, hingegen keine an den Stirnseiten (1) des verpackten Körpers auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 65/34 (2006.01); B65D 75/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/66 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992437 A1 20000412; DE 19846139 A1 20000420

INPADOC legal status

2002-11-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020503

2001-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TREVIRA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI