Global patent index - EP 0992445 A1

EP 0992445 A1 2000-04-12 - Thread Guide

Title (en)

Thread Guide

Title (de)

Fadenführungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de guidage de fil

Publication

EP 0992445 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98118787 A

Priority

EP 98118787 A

Abstract (en)

A traverse consists of contra-rotating guides (10) which engage the yarn (F) alternately. The winding spindle (2) and traverse guides (10) have separate motors (1,9) and are not linked by a mechanical drive. A controller (17) connects their speed and function, using stored data to produce a stepped precision build on the bobbin.

Abstract (de)

Die Fadenführungsvorrichtung zum Aufspulen von Fäden zu Kreuzspulen weist zwei gegenläufig rotierbare, übereinander angeordneten Fadenführerflügeln (10) zur Verlegung des Fadens (F) in jeweils einer Hubrichtung auf. In den Bewegungsumkehrpunkten der Fadenverlegung erfolgt eine Übergabe des Fadens (F) von dem einen zum anderen Fadenführerflügel (10) und umgekehrt. Zwischen dem Antrieb der Fadenführerflügel (10) und dem Antrieb der Spulenwelle (2) besteht keine zwangsläufige mechanische Verbindung, und für die Fadenführungsflügel (10) und für die Spulenwelle (2) ist je ein separater Antrieb (9 bzw. 1) vorgesehen. Die beiden Antriebe (1, 9) sind über eine gemeinsame Steuerung (17) verbunden, in welche die Spulparameter und die Wickelgesetze für eine Stufenpräzisionswicklung eingebbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/28; B65H 54/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 49/00 (2006.01); B65H 54/28 (2006.01); B65H 54/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/2839 (2013.01); B65H 54/383 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992445 A1 20000412; KR 20000028821 A 20000525; TW 530024 B 20030501

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021024

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020613

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI