Global Patent Index - EP 0992447 A1

EP 0992447 A1 2000-04-12 - Apparatus for coiling an elongated element

Title (en)

Apparatus for coiling an elongated element

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Ringwickeln aus langgestrecktem Gut

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mise en torches d'un élément longiligne

Publication

EP 0992447 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98811010 A

Priority

EP 98811010 A

Abstract (en)

Each coil builds up on equally spaced, narrow, axially oriented slats (340) arranged around a notional cylinder whose horizontal axis is perpendicular to the direction (X) of extrusion. At one end, the slats are cantilevered on mountings adjustable, to set inner diameter of the coil, along spokes (33) extending radially from a central disk. Radial side-bars (341), axially adjustable along the slats, determine the coil width. This assembly (33,340,341), with a supporting base (31), axle (36) and drive motor (331), can slide on transverse rails (30) into contact with a corresponding inboard disk (32), defining the other side of the coil. This disk, rotating freely on bearings (320) on a fixed central support (300), is then driven by the outboard disk. The traversing feeding head (4) directs newly extruded tube, etc. to form coils on each frame (A,B) alternately. Completed coils are bound by ligatures passed through their open centers by the retractable arms (52) of a binding unit (5), which also cuts the coil at the correct length. Relaxing devices on the slats free them from the coil, whose weight passes to rollers (60,61), raised from the bars. The outboard assembly then withdraws laterally (30), allowing the coil to roll into a railed (63) dispatch area. The supervising controller (7) is opt. integrated with the extrusion line controller.

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif de confection de torches comprend deux postes (A,B) disposés côte à côte et perpendiculairement à l'axe longitudinal (X) de la ligne de production. Chacun des postes est alimenté successivement par un élément longiligne afin de l'assembler en une torche. Les moyens de trancanage (4) et de ligature (5) sont commandés afin de passer successivement à la confection d'une torche dans un poste à la confection de la torche suivante dans l'autre poste. Des moyens d'évacuation automatiques (6) des torches terminées sont disposés en aval du dispositif. Un tel dispositif est particulièrement prévu pour la confection de torches de grand diamètre, vu qu'il ne nécessite pas le déplacement de masses ou de volumes importants. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/056; B65H 54/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/58 (2006.01); B65H 67/056 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/056 (2013.01); B65H 54/58 (2013.01); B65H 2701/331 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992447 A1 20000412; EP 0992447 B1 20040218; AT 259754 T 20040315; DE 69821760 D1 20040325; DE 69821760 T2 20040923; ES 2217526 T3 20041101

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151008

2016-11-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161125

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141027

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MAILLEFER S.A.

- Free text: MAILLEFER S.A.#ROUTE DU BOIS 37#1024 ECUBLENS (CH) -TRANSFER TO- MAILLEFER S.A.#ROUTE DU BOIS 37#1024 ECUBLENS (CH)

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2217526 T3

2004-06-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69821760 P 20040325

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAILLEFER S.A.

2003-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEXTROM HOLDING S.A.

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020724

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI