Global Patent Index - EP 0992473 A3

EP 0992473 A3 2000-04-26 - Gas generant for air bag

Title (en)

Gas generant for air bag

Title (de)

Gasgenerator für einen Airbag

Title (fr)

Générateur de gaz pour un coussin gonflable

Publication

EP 0992473 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99126027 A

Priority

  • EP 97105556 A
  • JP 19229496 A
  • JP 20180296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0820971A2] A gas-generant-molded-article for air bags which is prepared by molding a gas generant composition into a cylindrical form containing an opening hole, wherein the relationship between the linear burning velocity r (mm/second) of said gas generant composition under a pressure of 70 kgf/cm<2> and a thickness W (mm) of said molded article falls within a range represented by 0.005W/(2.r)0.3, with the linear burning velocity preferably falling within a range of from 1 to 12.5 mm/second. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06D 5/00 (2006.01); C06B 45/00 (2006.01); C06D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06D 5/06 (2013.01); C06B 45/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0820971 A2 19980128; EP 0820971 A3 19980225; EP 0820971 B1 20020116; CN 100348557 C 20071114; CN 1171385 A 19980128; CN 1173901 C 20041103; CN 1566040 A 20050119; DE 69709583 D1 20020221; DE 69709583 T2 20020613; DE 69729750 D1 20040805; DE 69729750 T2 20041014; EP 0992473 A2 20000412; EP 0992473 A3 20000426; EP 0992473 B1 20040630; ES 2171770 T3 20020916; ID 17501 A 19980108; KR 100511119 B1 20050822; MY 130861 A 20070731; MY 137495 A 20090227; TW 520351 B 20030211; US 6454887 B1 20020924; US 6527886 B1 20030304

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69729750

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050403

2005-06-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-04-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050403

2005-01-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041011

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69729750 P 20040805

2004-06-30 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0820971 P

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-06-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YAMATO, YO

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HIRATA, NORIMASA

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAKAHORI, TAKESHI

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YOKOYAMA, TAKUSHI

2004-06-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MATSUDA, NAOKI

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020128

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991227

2000-04-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 820971

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT