Global Patent Index - EP 0992579 A1

EP 0992579 A1 2000-04-12 - Stem cell factor

Title (en)

Stem cell factor

Title (de)

Stamzellfaktor

Title (fr)

Facteur de stimulation des cellules souches

Publication

EP 0992579 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99122861 A

Priority

  • EP 90310899 A
  • US 42238389 A
  • US 53719890 A
  • US 57361690 A
  • US 9005548 W
  • US 58970190 A

Abstract (en)

Novel stem cell factors, oligonucleotides encoding the same, and methods of production, are disclosed. Pharmaceutical compositions and methods of treating disorders involving blood cells are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 5/06; A61K 35/14; A61K 35/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/12 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/18 (2006.01); A61K 38/19 (2006.01); A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/04 (2006.01); A61P 7/06 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); C07K 1/36 (2006.01); C07K 14/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/475 (2006.01); C07K 14/535 (2006.01); C07K 16/22 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/19 (2006.01); C12N 15/64 (2006.01); C12N 15/70 (2006.01); C12N 15/79 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12R 1/19 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

C07K (2006.01); C12N (2006.01); C12P (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/475 (2013.01); C07K 16/22 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); Y10S 530/81 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DA] ZSEBO K M ET AL: "EFFECTS OF HEMATOPOIETIN-1 AND INTERLEUKIN 1 ACTIVTIES ON EARLY HEMATOPOIETIC CELLS OF THE BONE MARROW", BLOOD,US,PHILADELPHIA, PA, vol. 71, no. 4, pages 962-968, XP002910457, ISSN: 0006-4971

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0676470 A1 19951011; AT 194651 T 20000715; AT 403713 T 20080815; CN 1051937 A 19910605; CN 1075078 C 20011121; CN 1289526 C 20061213; CN 1306007 A 20010801; CZ 286303 B6 20000315; CZ 286304 B6 20000315; CZ 286305 B6 20000315; CZ 9700488 A3 20000112; CZ 9700490 A3 20000112; CZ 9700491 A3 20000112; DE 69033584 D1 20000817; DE 69033584 T2 20010308; DE 69034258 D1 20080918; DK 0423980 T3 20001009; EP 0423980 A1 19910424; EP 0423980 B1 20000712; EP 0992579 A1 20000412; EP 0992579 B1 20080806; EP 1241258 A2 20020918; EP 1241258 A3 20031210; GR 3034559 T3 20010131; HK 1010397 A1 20001229; SG 43009 A1 19971017; SG 59931 A1 19990222; SK 281484 B6 20010409; SK 281487 B6 20010409; SK 500890 A3 20010409; SK 98199 A3 20010409; US 6207417 B1 20010327; US 6207802 B1 20010327; US 6218148 B1 20010417

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20101005

2013-07-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130724

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20101004

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20101003

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081107

2010-10-27 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20101003

2010-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081004

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091020

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091014

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-01-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081106

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091030

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091014

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090914

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2009-08-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090709 AND 20090715

2009-07-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090507

2009-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2009-07-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BIOVITRUM AB (PUBL)

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080806

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080806

2009-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2314999

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080806

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080806

2008-11-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOHEST AG

2008-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69034258

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-09-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2008-08-06 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0423980

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2008-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040803

2002-10-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AMGEN INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AMGEN INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ZSEBO, KRISZTINA M.

2000-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SUGGS, SIDNEY VAUGHN

2000-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BOSSELMANN, ROBERT A.

2000-06-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MARTIN, FRANCIS HALL

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991117

2000-04-12 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 423980

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE