Global Patent Index - EP 0992590 A1

EP 0992590 A1 2000-04-12 - Process for bright annealing metals having high oxygen affinity

Title (en)

Process for bright annealing metals having high oxygen affinity

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Blankglühen von eine hohe Affinität zu Sauerstoff aufweisenden Metallen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour recuire à blanc des métaux à affinité élevée pour l'oxygène

Publication

EP 0992590 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99890293 A

Priority

AT 166298 A

Abstract (en)

Process for the bright annealing of metals having a high affinity to oxygen in a bell-type furnace using a protective gas selected from pure noble gas, e.g. argon, neon or helium combined with an oxygen binder, preferably titanium.

Abstract (de)

Um eine hohe Affinität zu Sauerstoff aufweisende Metalle in einem Haubenofen od. dgl. unter Schutzgas befriedigend blankglühen zu können, wird als Schutzgas ein möglichst reines Edelgas, wie Argon, Neon oder Helium, das mit höchstens 50 Vol. % eines reduzierenden Gases, beispielsweise Wasserstoff, vermischt ist, im Zusammenwirken mit einem Sauerstoffbinder, vorzugsweise Titan, verwendet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 1/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/663 (2006.01); C21D 1/74 (2006.01); C21D 1/76 (2006.01); C21D 9/67 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/67 (2013.01); C21D 1/76 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DE 4336771 A1 19950504 - LOI IND OFENANLAGEN [DE]
  • [Y] FR 2653448 A1 19910426 - AIR LIQUIDE [FR]
  • [A] US 4744837 A 19880517 - BROCKINGTON JAMES W [US], et al
  • [A] DE 3931195 A1 19900329 - BANDSTAHLKOMBINAT MATERN VEB [DD]
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 199 (C - 242) 12 September 1984 (1984-09-12)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 197737, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M29, AN 1977-65814Y, XP002127938
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 213 (C - 505) 17 June 1988 (1988-06-17)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992590 A1 20000412; AT 407262 B 20010226; AT A166298 A 20000615; JP 2000109934 A 20000418; KR 20000028808 A 20000525; TW 533245 B 20030521; US 6210499 B1 20010403; ZA 9906180 B 20000410

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050127

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030227

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI