Global Patent Index - EP 0992596 A2

EP 0992596 A2 2000-04-12 - Operating process for a shaft furnace and shaft furnace

Title (en)

Operating process for a shaft furnace and shaft furnace

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Schachtofens und Schachtofen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour l'opération d'un four à cuve et four à cuve

Publication

EP 0992596 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115255 A

Priority

  • DE 19835270 A
  • DE 19849336 A

Abstract (en)

Suction of a gas mixture containing oxygen to be delivered into the furnace takes place by means of at least one injector nozzle from the tuyere duct(s). The claimed shaft furnace is characterized by the fact that the suction opening(s) of the injector nozzle(s) is/are in effect connected to the tuyere duct(s).

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Sauerstoff-verzehrenden Schachtofens, insbesondere eines Kupolofens, zur Erzeugung von Metallen, insbesondere von Gußeisen, und Metalllegierungen, bei dem der Ofenschacht mit einem entsprechenden Einsatz kontinuierlich oder diskontinuierlich befüllt, bodenseitig die Gußeisenschmelze entnommen und dem Ofenschacht, insbesondere in seinem unteren Bereich ein Sauerstoff-enthaltendes Gasgemisch, insbesondere Luft, über wenigstens eine Injektordüse zugeführt und als Fördermedium Sauerstoff oder Sauerstoff im Gemisch mit anderen Gasen verwendet wird. Hierbei erfolgt die Ansaugung des Sauerstoffenthaltenden Gasgemisches mittels wenigstens einer Injektordüse aus der oder den Windleitungen. Bei dem erfindungsgemäßen Schachtofen, insbesondere Kupolofen, zur Erzeugung von Gußeisen mit einem Ofenschacht sowie mit wenigstens einer Injektordüse für die Zuführung eines Sauerstoff-enthaltendes Gasgemisches, insbesondere Luft, in den Ofenschacht, stehen die Ansaugöffnung(en) der Injektordüse(n) mit der oder den Windleitungen in Wirkverbindung. Zusätzlich können die Injektordüse(n) dreh- und/oder verschiebbar angeordnet sein.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 11/02; F27B 1/16; F27B 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21B 11/02 (2006.01); C21B 13/02 (2006.01); C21C 1/08 (2006.01); F27B 1/10 (2006.01); F27B 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21B 11/02 (2013.01); C21B 13/023 (2013.01); C21C 1/08 (2013.01); F27B 1/10 (2013.01); F27B 1/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992596 A2 20000412; EP 0992596 A3 20010808; DE 29825067 U1 20040819; PL 334677 A1 20000214

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-01 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20040711

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030326

2002-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19990802

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020115

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE AG

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19990802;SI

2001-08-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 22B 11/02 A, 7F 27B 1/16 B, 7F 27B 1/26 B, 7F 27D 3/16 B

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE GAS AG

2000-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LINDE TECHNISCHE GASE GMBH

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19990802;SI