Global Patent Index - EP 0992601 A1

EP 0992601 A1 2000-04-12 - Method for fabricating a component from an aluminium alloy by pressure die-casting

Title (en)

Method for fabricating a component from an aluminium alloy by pressure die-casting

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Bauteiles aus einer Aluminiumlegierung durch Druckgiessen

Title (fr)

Méthode de fabrication d'un composant d'alliage d' aluminium par moulage sous pression

Publication

EP 0992601 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810995 A

Priority

EP 98810995 A

Abstract (en)

Production of an aluminum-based component comprises casting an alloy consisting of (in wt.%): 9.5-11.5 Si, 0.3-0.6 Mn, 0.15-0.35 Fe, 0.1-0.4 Mg, maximum 0.1 Ti, 90-180 ppm Sr, 0.1-0.3 Cr, 0.1-0.3 Ni, 0.1-0.3 Co and a balance of Al with maximum 0.05 wt.% impurities into a component part, partially solution annealing at 400-460o C for 20-120 minutes, and cooling in air.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Bauteiles mit hohen Duktilitätsanforderungen aus einer Aluminiumlegierung durch Druckgiessen wird eine Legierung mit 9.5 bis 11.5: Gew.-% Silizium; 0.3 bis 0.6: Gew.-% Mangan; 0.15 bis 0.35: Gew.-% Eisen; 0.1 bis 0.4: Gew.-% Magnesium; max. 0.1: Gew.-% Titan; 90 bis 180: ppm Strontium wahlweise noch 0.1 bis 0.3: Gew.-% Chrom; 0.1 bis 0.3: Gew.-% Nickel; 0.1 bis 0.3: Gew.-% Kobolt und als Rest Aluminium mit herstellungsbedingten Verunreinigungen, einzeln max. 0.05 Gew.-%, insgesamt max. 0.2 Gew.-%, zum Bauteil gegossen, das gegossene Bauteil nachfolgend in einem Temperaturbereich von 400 bis 460°C während einer Zeitdauer von 20 bis 120 min partiell lösungsgeglüht und anschliessend an Luft abgekühlt. Durch die partielle Lösungsglühung ohne schroffes Abschrecken können Bauteile verzugsfrei hergestellt werden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22F 1/043; C22C 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/04 (2006.01); C22F 1/043 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/04 (2013.01); C22F 1/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] EP 0687742 A1 19951220 - RHEINFELDEN ALUMINIUM GMBH [DE]
  • [A] EP 0630982 A1 19941228 - GROOTES M J INVESTMENTS [ZA]
  • [X] SCHNEIDER W ET AL: "WAERMEBEHANDLUNG VON ALUMINIUM-GUSSLEGIERUNGEN FUR DAS VAKUUM-DRUCKGIESSEN", GIESSEREI, vol. 84, no. 8, 21 April 1997 (1997-04-21), pages 30, 33 - 42, XP000698127
  • [A] SCHNEIDER W ET AL: "WAERMEBEHANDLUNG VON ALUMINIUM-GUSSLEGIERUNGEN FUR DAS VAKUUM- DRUCKGIESSEN TEIL 4: ERGEBNISSE VON AUSLAGERUNGSVERSUCHEN", GIESSEREI, vol. 83, no. 19, 30 September 1996 (1996-09-30), pages 23 - 27, XP000627093
  • [A] SCHNEIDER W ET AL: "WAERMEBEHANDLUNG VON ALUMINIUM-GUSSLEGIERUNGEN FUR DAS VAKUUM- DRUCKGIESSEN TEIL 3: VERSUCHSERGEBNISSE NACH LOSUNGSGLUHEN UND ABSCHRECKEN", GIESSEREI, vol. 83, no. 15, 29 July 1996 (1996-07-29), pages 17 - 22, XP002087898
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 126 (C - 228) 13 June 1984 (1984-06-13)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 9544, Derwent World Patents Index; Class A32, AN 89-375716, XP002087900
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 098, no. 002 30 January 1998 (1998-01-30)
  • [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 20, 16 May 1983, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 165221, SEMENOVA, O. N. ET AL: "Effect of chemical composition and conditions for production of the AL4SK alloy on its properties" XP002087899 & LITEINOE PROIZVOD. (1982), (12), 19-20 CODEN: LIPRAX;ISSN: 0024-449X, 1982LITEINOE PROIZVOD. (1982), (12), 19-20 CODEN: LIPRAX;ISSN: 0024-449X1982

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992601 A1 20000412; AT 225868 T 20021015; DE 59903009 D1 20021114; DK 0997550 T3 20030210; EP 0997550 A1 20000503; EP 0997550 B1 20021009; ES 2181382 T3 20030216; PT 997550 E 20030228; SI 0997550 T1 20030430

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001013

2001-01-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI