Global Patent Index - EP 0992615 B1

EP 0992615 B1 2001-02-14 - Startkathoden aus Kupferband für die Kupferelektrolyse und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung

Title (en)

Startkathoden aus Kupferband für die Kupferelektrolyse und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung

Title (de)

Copper cathode starting sheets for copper electrolysis and manufacture thereof

Title (fr)

Feuille de départ cathodique en cuivre pour l'électrolyse du cuivre et sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0992615 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98118542 A

Priority

EP 98118542 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0992615A1] Start cathode consists of rolled copper strip according to DIN 1708, 1737 and 17670 having a thickness of 0.3-1.2 mm which is soft annealed after rolling and has a strength of 210-240 N/mm<2>. The strip is cut into a length and width corresponding to the electrolysis bath. The cut sheet has a planar grease-free surface. Copper side strips having a thickness of 0.3-0.6 mm are fixed to the insert sides of the sheet. An Independent claim is also included for the production of start cathodes comprising: (a) forming a rolled, roll-hardened copper strip having a thickness of 0.3-1.2 mm of the copper sort according to DIN 1708, 1737 and 17670; (b) soft annealing the roll-hardened at furnace temperatures of 700-750o C and flow-through velocities of 20-70 m/min.; (c) degreasing the surfaces; (d) cutting the cooled copper strip to the required starting sheet diameters; (e) fixing side strips of thickness 0.3-0.6 mm from the copper strip and applying the contact rods; and (f) adjusting the start cathodes.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft Startkathoden aus Kupferband für die Kupferelektrolyse sowie ein Verfahren zur Herstellung der Startkathoden. Ausgehend von den Nachteilen des bekannten Standes der Technik war es Aufgabe, Startkathoden zu schaffen, die während der Kupferelektrolyse einen "Memory-Effekt" ausschließen, mit denen eine hohe Produktionsleistung an Elektrolytkupfer erreicht werden kann und die auch aus direkt verformten, als Coil vorliegendem Kupferbandmaterial herstellbar sind. Ferner soll ein geeignetes Verfahren zur Herstellung der Startkathoden geschaffen werden, das insbesondere auch zur Verarbeitung von konventionell hergestelltem Kupferband geeignet ist. Die vorgeschlagenen Startkathoden bestehen aus gewalztem Kupferband mit einer Dicke von 0,3 bis 1,2 mm, das nach dem Walzen weichgeglüht ist und eine Festigkeit von 210 bis 240 N/mm<2> aufweist. Das Kupferband wird auf die durch die Abmessungen des Elektrolysebades bestimmte Länge und Breite zugeschnitten ist und weist eine plane, gradarme und fettfreie Oberfläche auf. An der Einhängeseite der Bleche sind Ohrenstreifen aus Kupferband mit einer Dicke von 0,3 bis 0,6 mm befestigt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25C 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/02 (2006.01); C22F 1/08 (2006.01); C25C 1/12 (2006.01); C25C 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25C 7/02 (2013.01); C22F 1/08 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49991 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GR IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992615 A1 20000412; EP 0992615 B1 20010214; AR 021841 A1 20020807; AT 199172 T 20010215; AU 6086699 A 20000426; AU 762788 B2 20030703; BR 9907135 A 20001003; BR 9907135 B1 20090811; CA 2312375 A1 20000413; CA 2312375 C 20080513; CN 1283844 C 20061108; CN 1287580 A 20010314; DE 19982000 D2 20020725; DE 59800478 D1 20010322; ES 2156425 T3 20010616; ID 24867 A 20000831; JP 2002526662 A 20020820; MX PA00004551 A 20020424; PE 12092000 A1 20001228; RU 2221088 C2 20040110; US 6350355 B1 20020226; WO 0020661 A1 20000413

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091002

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110314

2011-03-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110328

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KAZ KUPFER G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20091031

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081024

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081023

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-04-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2006-11-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-02-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156425 T3

2001-05-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010518

2001-05-14 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010514

2001-05-14 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010514

2001-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800478 20010322

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GR IT NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-02-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-02-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-02-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199172 T 20010215

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GR IT NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990331

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GR IT NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI