Global Patent Index - EP 0992624 A1

EP 0992624 A1 2000-04-12 - Apparatus for removing rotating flows

Title (en)

Apparatus for removing rotating flows

Title (de)

Drallbrecher

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour éliminer des courants tourbillonaires

Publication

EP 0992624 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112903 A

Priority

DE 19845898 A

Abstract (en)

At the vessel (10) outlet and/or in the following pipework (11, 12) there is a flow-straightener, which reduces or preferably eliminates secondary swirling flows which develop around the main flow direction. An Independent claim is included for the corresponding method.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft den Konstanten Teil einer Papier- oder Kartonmaschine mit Behältern (10) und Rohrleitungen (2,11,12,13), die eine faserhaltige Suspension führen, wobei die Suspension eine Hauptströmungsrichtung (19) aufweist, und ein Verfahren zur Reduzierung und Vermeidung von Pulsationen im Konstanten Teil der Papier- oder Kartonmaschine. Die Erfindung ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß im Auslaufbereich eines Behälters (10) und/oder in der nachfolgenden Rohrleitung (2,11,12) mindestens ein Mittel zur Reduktion, vorzugsweise zur Auslöschung von Drallströmungen um die Hauptströmungsrichtung (19) vorgesehen ist. Das erfindungsgemäße Verfahren ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß im Auslaufbereich eines fluidführenden Behälters (10) und/oder in der nachfolgenden Rohrleitung (2,11,12) Drallströmungen vermieden werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992624 A1 20000412; DE 19845898 A1 20000427

INPADOC legal status


2001-06-20 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20010405

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI