Global Patent Index - EP 0992625 A1

EP 0992625 A1 2000-04-12 - Headbox system and method for improving the transverse consistency profile of a fiber web

Title (en)

Headbox system and method for improving the transverse consistency profile of a fiber web

Title (de)

Verfahren und Stoffauflaufsystem zur Verbesserung des Konsistenzquerprofils einer Faserbahn

Title (fr)

Système de caisse de tête et procédé pour l'amélioration du profil transversal de la consistence d'une bande fibreuse

Publication

EP 0992625 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112904 A

Priority

DE 19843727 A

Abstract (en)

In the control of the lateral consistency profile of a paper or cardboard web, the stock inlet has a fiber suspension flow of high consistency and a fiber suspension flow of low consistency together with a third fiber suspension flow of a different fiber composition or clear water. In the control of the lateral consistency profile of a paper or cardboard web, the stock inlet has a fiber suspension flow (QH) of high consistency and a fiber suspension flow (QL) of low consistency together with a third fiber suspension flow (QC) of a different fiber composition or clear water. The third suspension (QC) is mixed with the other two suspension flows (QH,QL) by sections across the machine width. The third suspension flow (QC) has a different proportion of solid matter in its composition from the other two fiber suspensions (QH,QL). The first fiber suspension has a normal composition, the second suspension is water from the fourdrinier section of the machine, and the third suspension is a clarified filtrate or clear water or diluted retention material. The suspensions contain different proportions of filling materials, fibers and fiber lengths and shrinkage characteristics. The second suspension is mainly of fibers, and the third suspension is mainly of filling materials. The fiber content of the second suspension is mainly of fibers with a high shrinkage, and the fiber content of the third suspension is mainly of fibers with a low shrinkage, together with a fourth suspension flow with a mainly filling material content. A fifth suspension flow can be introduced, mainly of retention materials. The sectional volume flow of the separate suspensions is controlled at least partially, and preferably wholly. An Independent claim is included for a stock inlet with a suspension flow (3) upstream of the turbulence generator (5) and a flow control (7) for the third suspension flow into the stock inlet, which has a different suspension composition from the other two suspension flows.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und ein Stoffauflaufsystem zur Verbesserung des Konsistenzquerprofils einer Faserbahn, insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn, im Naßprozeß, wobei zwei Suspensionen sektional vermischt werden und das Flächengewichtsquerprofil durch Beeinflussung der sektionalen Mischungsverhältnisse geregelt wird. Das Verfahren ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß mindestens eine dritte Suspension Q3 mit niedrigerem oder höherem Feststoffgehalt sektioniert über die Maschinenbreite zugemischt wird, wobei sich die prozentuale Zusammensetzung der Feststoffanteile der dritten Suspension von der Zusammensetzung der ersten und zweiten Suspension unterscheidet. Das erfindungsgemäße Stoffauflaufsystem ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß stromaufwärts des Turbulenzerzeugers und/oder je Sektion in z-Richtung der Faserbahn gleichwirkend mindestens ein dritter Satz von Einzelzuführungen mit durchflußbeeinflussenden Mitteln für eine dritte Suspension vorgesehen ist, deren Feststoffzusammensetzung sich von der ersten und zweiten Suspension unterscheidet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/06 (2006.01); D21F 1/08 (2006.01); D21F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19843727 A1 20000330; AT 255655 T 20031215; CA 2283009 A1 20000324; EP 0992625 A1 20000412; EP 0992625 B1 20031203; JP 2000096474 A 20000404; JP 4546593 B2 20100915; US 6299731 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59907923

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120705

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120706

2013-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120705

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 255655

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120705

2013-03-05 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110714

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110714

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-03-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907923

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020621

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BEGEMANN, ULRICH

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: THOMAS, DIRK

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI