Global patent index - EP 0992626 A2

EP 0992626 A2 2000-04-12 - Metering system for devices for coating webs, particularly paper or board web

Title (en)

Metering system for devices for coating webs, particularly paper or board web

Title (de)

Dosiersystem für Vorrichtungen zum Beschichten von Materialbahnen, insbesondere Papier- oder Kartonbahnen

Title (fr)

Système de dosage pour appareils d'enduction de bandes, en particulier de papier ou de carton

Publication

EP 0992626 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118438 A

Priority

DE 19846708 A

Abstract (en)

Between divided pressure tubing sections (6) and rear of the wiper bed, a resilient section (8) intervenes. This is an axial buffer for the wiper rod (2), which equalizes pressure transmission from the compression tube sections (6) onto the wiper bed (3). Preferred features: The resilient section has a variable modulus of elasticity. It is a pressure tube (8) extending continuously over the width of the work which is one-piece with the wiper bed. The wiper bed, continuous tube and divided pressure tube (6) are arranged in a common, transversely-adjustable holder (5). The divided tube, is located in front of the rear inner wall of the holder, hence presses from behind, against the continuous pressure tube. The continuous pressure tube is connected by a central bridge parallel to the wiper rod, to the remainder of the wiper bed. The continuous tube presses against the rear of the bed, with a contact area varying in accordance with applied pressure. Each pressure chamber of the divided tube has a compressed air connection (7), led below through the holder. Wall thickness of the continuous pressure tube exceeds that of the divided pressure tube.

Abstract (de)

In Vorrichtungen zum Beschichten von Materialbahnen, insbesondere Papier- oder Kartonbahnen, sind Dosiersysteme bekannt, die eine Rakelstange (2) als Dosierelement aufweisen, die von einem Rakelbett (3) aus elastischem, bevorzugt gummielastischem Material gehalten wird. Das Rakelbett (3) ist in einem Halter gelagert und gegen seine der Rakelstange (2) abgewandte Rückseite drückt ein Druckschlauch (6), der sich über die Arbeitsbreite erstreckt und quer über die Arbeitsbreite in Druckkammern (6.1-6.4) unterteilt ist, die jeweils getrennt mit Druckluft beaufschlagbar sind. Nach der Erfindung ist zwischen dem Druckschlauch (6) und der Rückseite des Rakelbetts (3) ein elastisches Element angeordnet, das als in Achsrichtung der Rakelstange (2) wirksamer Puffer ausgleichend auf die Druckübertragung vom Druckschlauch (6) auf das Rakelbett (3) wirkt. Bevorzugt ist das elastische Element ein sich quer über die Arbeitsbreite erstreckender durchgehender Druckschlauch (8). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 23/32; B05C 11/02; D21H 25/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 11/02 (2006.01); D21H 23/32 (2006.01); D21H 25/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 11/025 (2013.01); B05C 11/042 (2013.01); D21H 23/32 (2013.01); D21H 25/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992626 A2 20000412; EP 0992626 A3 20010801; DE 19846708 A1 20000413; US 6379462 B1 20020430

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050507

2005-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041227

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011221

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI