Global Patent Index - EP 0992627 A1

EP 0992627 A1 2000-04-12 - Fixation of a resilient switch tongue

Title (en)

Fixation of a resilient switch tongue

Title (de)

Befestigung für eine federnd bewegliche Weichenzunge

Title (fr)

Fixation d'une lame d'aiguille élastique

Publication

EP 0992627 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118131 A

Priority

DE 19846700 A

Abstract (en)

The fastening is for a blade in grooved rail points, and a positive locking and clamping unit to connect the blade (5) to a connection rail. The blade has adjusters on the side away from the clamping unit, to permit horizontal adjustment of the root section (4) of the blade at right angles to the longitudinal direction of the connection rail. The adjusters are horizontal screw units located between the blade and contact face, pref. in front of or on a rigid rail (2).

Abstract (de)

Um eine Befestigung für eine federnd bewegliche Zunge (5) in einer Rillenschienenweiche, letztere bestehend aus einer Backenschiene (2), einer Anschlußschiene (18), einer Beischiene (3), einer zwischen Beischiene (3) und Backenschiene (2) angeordneten Gleitplatte (7), auf der die Zunge (5) aufliegt und einer Formschluß- und Spanneinrichtung zum stoffschlußfreien, eine Stoßfuge (19) aufweisenden Anschluß der Zunge (5) an die Anschlußschiene (18), wobei die Spanneinrichtung derartig ausgebildet ist, daß sie die Zunge (5) am an die Anschlußschiene (18) angrenzenden Wurzelbereich (4) unter anderem horizontal verspannt, zu schaffen, die es ermöglicht, standartisierte Zungen auch für teilverschlissene Weichen einzusetzen und Maß- und Formtoleranzen der Anschlußteile in einfacher Weise auszugleichen, weist die Zunge (5) an der von der Spanneinrichtung abgewandten Seite Stellmittel auf, die eine horizontale Verstellung des Wurzelbereichs (4) der Zunge (5) quer zur Längserstreckung der Anschlußschiene (18) ermöglichen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4201757 A1 19930812 - VER WEICHENBAU GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992627 A1 20000412; DE 19846700 C1 20000824

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040211

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP WEICHENBAU GMBH

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI LU

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI LU

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI