Global Patent Index - EP 0992630 A3

EP 0992630 A3 2003-06-04 - Work vehicle with levelling blade support

Title (en)

Work vehicle with levelling blade support

Title (de)

Arbeitsfahrzeug mit Abstützplanierschild

Title (fr)

Engin de travaux avec support de lame nivelleuse

Publication

EP 0992630 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99119858 A

Priority

DE 29817945 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0992630A2] The scraper blade is adjusted for normal operation by two hydraulic rams (4,5) and by a parallel support linkage. One of the support elements comprises a flat plate (2) which is split by a line (14) parallel to one end, into two sections linked by a pivot (11) to allow relative settings between the two sections. This effectively tilts the scraper blade in either direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 3/76; E02F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/844 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29817945 U1 20000120; EP 0992630 A2 20000412; EP 0992630 A3 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031205

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 02F 3/76 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 02F 9/02 B

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI