Global Patent Index - EP 0992636 A2

EP 0992636 A2 2000-04-12 - Sound insulating panel for interior decoration

Title (en)

Sound insulating panel for interior decoration

Title (de)

Schallabsorbierende Platte für die Raumgestaltung

Title (fr)

Panneau isolant acoustique pour l'aménagement intérieur

Publication

EP 0992636 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99810857 A

Priority

CH 202698 A

Abstract (en)

A sound cladding has a cover layer of wood, wood veneer or similar material and with a pattern of perforations with diameters less than 1.5 mm. The cover layer is bonded to a sound absorbing backing (3) which comprises a self supporting structure with voids for sound damping. The voids are machined or molded into the material or the layer is made of separate chunks loosely bonded together separated by voids. The perforations can be punched, drilled or laser cut with the smallest diameters of 0.5 mm giving an overall smooth appearance to the cover layer.

Abstract (de)

Die schallabsorbierende Platte weist eine Frontseite (9) auf, in die mehrere Löcher für die Durchleitung von Schall zu einer rückseitig angeordneten Schicht (3) aus schallabsorbierendem Material eingearbeitet sind. Frontseitig ist eine Membran als Deckschicht (2) aus Holz oder holzähnlichem Werkstoff angeordnet und die genannten Löcher sind Mikroperforationen (5) in dieser Deckschicht (2). Hinter der Deckschicht (2) ist eine tragende Schicht (3) mit Durchgängen (13) für die Schallaufnahme angeordnet. Die Deckschicht (2) und die tragende Schicht (3) sind miteinander fest verbunden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/86 (2006.01); G10K 11/172 (2006.01); E04B 1/74 (2006.01); E04B 1/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/86 (2013.01); G10K 11/172 (2013.01); A47B 2220/13 (2013.01); E04B 2001/746 (2013.01); E04B 2001/8414 (2013.01); E04B 2001/8461 (2013.01); E04B 2001/8485 (2013.01); E04B 2001/849 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29911495 U1 19990902; CA 2285502 A1 20000406; EP 0992636 A2 20000412; EP 0992636 A3 20010606

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-04-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI