Global Patent Index - EP 0992646 A1

EP 0992646 A1 2000-04-12 - Espagnolette or espagnolette lock for doors, windows or the like

Title (en)

Espagnolette or espagnolette lock for doors, windows or the like

Title (de)

Treibstange oder Treibstangenschloss für Türen, Fenster oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Crémone ou crémone-serrure pour porte, fenêtre ou analogue

Publication

EP 0992646 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440256 A

Priority

FR 9812764 A

Abstract (en)

The lock comprises a main body within which a toothed boss (15) communicates with the lock bolt and handle assembly. The toothed boss communicates with a rack and pinion (17) that is connected to a carriage (18) that actuates the bolt rods (11). An internal space (13) allows full rotation of the boss such that single handle operation operates upper and lower bolt assemblies.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a trait à une crémone ou crémone-serrure comprenant un boîtier (9) prévu apte à prendre position dans un entaillage (7) d'un châssis ouvrant (2) de porte, fenêtre ou analogue, ce boîtier (9) renfermant un mécanisme de commande (10) comprenant au moins un fouillot (13) pourvu d'une denture (16) sur laquelle vient s'engréner une crémaillère (17) équipant, en particulier, un chevalet (18), la ou les tringles de manoeuvre (11, 11A) venant s'étendre au-dessus et/ou en-dessous dudit boîtier (9), à l'arrière d'une têtière (12) dont est rendu solidaire ce dernier. Selon l'invention, dans le fond (22) du boîtier (9) est ménagé un carter semi-circulaire (23), coaxial au fouillot (13) pour la réception et le guidage de ce dernier, dans la paroi semi-cylindrique (24) de ce carter (23) étant prévue une lumière (25) dans laquelle vient s'inscrire un rebord (26) s'étendant en périphérie du moyeu (15) du fouillot (13). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992646 A1 20000412; EP 0992646 B1 20060607; DE 69931722 D1 20060720; DE 69931722 T2 20070614; ES 2265680 T3 20070216; FR 2784414 A1 20000414; FR 2784414 B1 20001229

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69931722

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120531

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101005

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070921

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070922

2008-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070922

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070921

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070921

2007-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070308

2007-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2265680

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060921

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69931722

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-07-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-06-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030903

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000610

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI