Global Patent Index - EP 0992650 A3

EP 0992650 A3 2000-06-28 - Flexible door

Title (en)

Flexible door

Title (de)

Biegsame Tür

Title (fr)

Porte souple

Publication

EP 0992650 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99119472 A

Priority

IT TO980832 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0992650A2] A flexible door comprises two metal posts (1) connected by an upper cross-member (2) in which a winding roller is housed. The movable closure element of the door is constituted by a flexible sheet (3) of plastics material having at least one transverse reinforcing bar (4). The side edges of the flexible sheet (3) slide in vertical guides (5) carried by the two posts (1) and each comprising two facing flexible vertical strips (6). Each strip (6) is constituted by at least one layer of fabric made of synthetic fibres which has a high transverse stiffness much greater than its longitudinal stiffness. The outer longitudinal edge of each strip (6) is fixed to the respective metal post (1) and the strip (6) projects inwardly from the post (1), relative to the door opening. In the event of a knock, the guide (5) deforms resiliently to allow the flexible sheet (3) to come out, the sheet (3) subsequently going back into the guide automatically. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/58; E06B 9/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/13 (2006.01); E06B 9/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/13 (2013.01); E06B 9/581 (2013.01); E06B 2009/585 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992650 A2 20000412; EP 0992650 A3 20000628; IT 1305117 B1 20010410; IT TO980832 A1 20000405

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040620

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB PT

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI