Global Patent Index - EP 0992656 A1

EP 0992656 A1 2000-04-12 - Turbomachine to compress or expand a compressible medium

Title (en)

Turbomachine to compress or expand a compressible medium

Title (de)

Strömungsmaschine zum Verdichten oder Entspannen eines komprimierbaren Mediums

Title (fr)

Turbomachine pour comprimer ou détendre un fluide comprimable

Publication

EP 0992656 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810999 A

Priority

EP 98810999 A

Abstract (en)

The compressor has a rotor supporting at least one set of radial rotor blades (1), perpendicular to the rotor axis (5), enclosed by a compressor housing (4), with the compressible medium supplied axially. The inside wall (3) of the housing has an annular channel system (6) facing the free ends (2) of the rotor blades, with a channel (7,8) communicating with the housing interior on both sides of the rotor blades, for entry of the medium to be compressed and exit of the compressed medium respectively.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Strömungsmaschine zum Verdichten oder Entspannen eines komprimierbaren Mediums, mit einem Rotor, an dem senkrecht zur Rotorachse (5) wenigstens eine Laufschaufelreihe angeordnet ist, deren einzelne Laufschaufeln (1) radialseitig freie Lautschaufelenden (2) aufweisen, die der Innenwand (3) eines den Rotor umgebenden Gehäuses (4) freibeweglich gegenüberstehen, durch dessen Innenraum das komprimierbare Medium axial zur Rotorachse (5) strömt. Die Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß innerhalb des den Rotor umgebenden Gehäuses (4), den freien Enden (2) der Laufschaufeln (1) einer Laufschaufelreihe unmittelbar radial gegenüberliegend, ein Ringkanalsystem (6) vorgesehen ist, das im Bereich der Laufschaufelenden (2) einseitig offen ausgebildet sowie von den Laufschaufelenden (2) begrenzbar ist und beidseitig zur Laufschaufelreihe jeweils einen Öffnungskanal (7, 8) aufweist, durch dessen einen Öffnungskanal (7) das komprimierbare Medium aus dem Innenraum des Gehäuses (4) in das Innere des Ringkanalsystem (6) einströmt und durch den zweiten Öffnungskanal (8) das komprimierbare Medium aus dem Ringkanalsystem (6) in den Innenraum des Gehäuses (4) austritt, und daß das Ringkanalsystem (6) sowie die Laufschaufelenden (2) zumindest in Bereichen, die an den Öffnungskanälen (7, 8) angrenzen, Oberflächenkonturen aufweisen, durch an den Stellen innerhalb des Ringkanalsystems (6), an denen die Öffnungskanäle (7, 8) einmünden, Druckverhältnisse geschaffen werden, die sich durch die Ausbildung einer dynamischen Ringströmung innerhalb des Ringkanalsystems (6) einstellen und in etwa den statischen Druckverhältnissen entsprechen, die im Innenraum des Gehäuses jeweils im Bereich der Öffnungskanäle vorherrschen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 11/10; F01D 5/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/20 (2006.01); F01D 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/10 (2013.01); F01D 5/225 (2013.01); F04D 29/164 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992656 A1 20000412; EP 0992656 B1 20030910; DE 59809578 D1 20031016; US 6264425 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59809578

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59809578

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-02-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040104

2004-01-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809578 P 20031016

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-11-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI