Global Patent Index - EP 0992658 A1

EP 0992658 A1 2000-04-12 - Electromagnetic valve actuator

Title (en)

Electromagnetic valve actuator

Title (de)

Elektromagnetischer Ventil-Aktuator

Title (fr)

Actionneur électromagnétique de soupape

Publication

EP 0992658 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99400877 A

Priority

  • FR 9812489 A
  • FR 9812940 A

Abstract (en)

The motor vehicle internal combustion engine valve (25) stem slides in a sleeve in the cylinder head (12). An end flange (31) retains a spring (28b) against the base of a cylindrical cavity in the head. A stem extension (24) ends in a similar flange (30), also spring-loaded (28a). This upper spring is seated on the core (16), fixed to the head and projecting into the cavity. The extension ends in a laminated armature (22) contained in a core cavity. The valve (25) has an integral stem sliding in a sleeve in the cylinder head (12). An end flange (31) retains a spring (28b) against the base of a cylindrical cavity in the head. A stem extension (24), aligned with and abutting the stem, ends in a similar flange (30), also spring-loaded (28a). This upper spring is seated on part of the magnet core (16), fixed to the head and projecting into the cavity. The extension, sliding in a sleeve (26) in the core, ends in a laminated armature (22) contained in a core cavity. The springs and valve are so dimensioned that, with the magnet deenergised, the valve's position is intermediate between fully open and fully closed. The core's removable top (14) encloses the exciting coil (38), which in turn is penetrated by a limb of the iron circuit. The magnet coil is energised, via an amplifier, from a controller - opt., integral with the engine management unit - receiving input from a position sensor mounted on the valve. The alternative displacements of the armature in the air-gaps provided within the core establish alternative stable flux paths associated with open and closed valve positions.

Abstract (fr)

L'actionneur électromagnétique a une palette (22) en matériau ferromagnétique fixée à la queue de soupape, des ressorts prévus pour maintenir au repos la soupape dans une position médiane entre des positions d'ouverture complète et de fermeture et une bobine unique (38) montée sur un circuit ferromagnétique. Ce circuit présente, en combinaison avec la palette, deux cheminements stables de flux magnétiques correspondant l'un et l'autre à une valeur faible d'entrefer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01); H01F 7/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992658 A1 20000412; EP 0992658 B1 20030521; DE 69908057 D1 20030626; DE 69908057 T2 20040318; JP 2004506826 A 20040304; US 6651954 B1 20031125; WO 0020731 A1 20000413; WO 0020731 A9 20030306

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080409

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080409

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080409

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070607

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070410

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070410

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-09-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908057 P 20030626

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PORCHER, YVES

2003-05-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FIACCABRINO, CALOGERO

2003-05-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DONCE, LUCIEN

2003-05-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LANOE, THIERRY

2003-01-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOHNSON CONTROLS AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRONICS

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT NL SE

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000303

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI