Global Patent Index - EP 0992666 A2

EP 0992666 A2 2000-04-12 - Cylinder-selective regulation of the air/fuel ratio

Title (en)

Cylinder-selective regulation of the air/fuel ratio

Title (de)

Zylinderselektive Regelung des Luft-Kraftstoff-Verhältnisses

Title (fr)

Régulation par cylindre du taux air/carburant

Publication

EP 0992666 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117175 A

Priority

DE 19846393 A

Abstract (en)

A lambda probe (30) in an exhaust tract sends a gas tension signal corresponding to an air-fuel ratio to be fed into a computer (24), specifying the air-fuel ratio for each cylinder. Relying on a base fuel injection value and identified air-fuel ratios for each cylinder, a fuel apportioning unit (FAU) specifies an amount of injected fuel. A fuel feeder unit (20) supplies an internal combustion engine's (10) cylinders with an amount of injected fuel specified by the FAU. Gas tension variation in relation to gas tension signals from adjacent cylinders is identified for each cylinder. Amounts to be injected are adjusted by relying on this gas tension variation.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine zylinderselektive Regelung des Luft-Kraftstoff-Verhältnisses bei einem mehrzylindrigen Verbrennungsmotor, bei der eine im Abgastrakt angeordnete Lamda-Sonde (30) ein einem Luft-Kraftstoff-Verhältnis entsprechendes Spannungssignal erzeugt, das Spannungssignal einer Berechnungseinheit (24) zugeführt wird, welche das Luft-Kraftstoff-Verhältnis für jeden einzelnen Zylinders bestimmt, eine Kraftstoffzuteilungseinheit eine Kraftstoff-Einspritzmenge zumindest in Abhängigkeit von einem Basis-Kraftstoffeinspritzwert und den ermittelten Luft-Kraftstoff-Verhältnissen der einzelnen Zylinder bestimmt und eine Kraftstoffzufuhreinheit (20) die von der Kraftstoffzuteilungseinheit bestimmte Kraftstoff-Einspritzmenge den Zylindern des Verbrennungsmotor (10) zuführt. Die Aufgabe, eine obengenannte zylinderselektive Regelung auf einfache und kostengünstige Weise zu realisieren, ist dadurch gelöst, daß die Berechnungseinheit (24) das Spannungssignal kurbelwinkelsynchron erfaßt und einem bestimmten Zylinder zuordnet, daß für jeden Zylinder eine Spannungsabweichung in Relation zu den Spannungssignalen der benachbarten Zylindern bestimmt wird und daß eine Korrektur der Einspritzmenge in Abhänigigkeit der Spannungsabweichung durchgeführt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/36; F02D 41/14; F02D 41/26; F02D 41/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/008 (2013.01); F02D 41/1458 (2013.01); F02D 41/1474 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992666 A2 20000412; EP 0992666 A3 20010912; EP 0992666 B1 20080326; DE 19846393 A1 20000413; DE 59914705 D1 20080508; ES 2301224 T3 20080616; JP 2000110630 A 20000418; US 6276349 B1 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2015-05-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2015-05-05 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130901

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130901

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59914705

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130901

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130911

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121030

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121012

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120814

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-03-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081230

2009-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-07-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2301224 T3

2008-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914705 P 20080508

2008-04-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080407

2008-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2008-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041112

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020222

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02D 41/36 A, 7F 02D 41/14 B, 7F 02D 41/26 B, 7F 02D 41/30 B, 7F 02D 41/34 B

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI