Global Patent Index - EP 0992669 A2

EP 0992669 A2 2000-04-12 - Internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0992669 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99118823 A

Priority

  • JP 28121398 A
  • JP 29538198 A
  • JP 32101598 A

Abstract (en)

At a time of executing a low temperature combustion in which an amount of an EGR gas supplied within a combustion chamber (5) is more than an amount of the EGR gas when a generation amount of a soot becomes peak and the soot is hardly generated and changing a speed of an automatic transmission (60), in order to reduce a generated torque, an injection amount of a fuel injected from a fuel injection valve (6) is corrected to be increased so as to reduce an air fuel ratio, or a fuel injection timing is delayed, or an opening degree of an EGR control valve (31) is corrected to be increased so as to correct an amount of the EGR gas to increase, and further at a time of executing a combustion in which the amount of the EGR gas supplied within a combustion chamber (5) is less than the amount of the EGR gas when a generation amount of a soot becomes peak and the soot is hardly generated and changing a speed of an automatic transmission (60), in order to reduce a generated torque, the injection amount of the fuel injected from the fuel injection valve (6) is corrected to be reduced. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 43/00; F02D 21/08; F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 21/08 (2006.01); F02D 41/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/38 (2013.01); F02D 21/08 (2013.01); F02D 35/025 (2013.01); F02D 41/023 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01); F02B 29/0406 (2013.01); F02D 41/0057 (2013.01); F02D 2250/32 (2013.01); F02M 26/06 (2013.01); F02M 26/15 (2016.02); F02M 26/23 (2016.02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992669 A2 20000412; EP 0992669 A3 20010919; EP 0992669 B1 20040519; DE 69917405 D1 20040624; DE 69917405 T2 20050512

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110923

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69917405

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110923

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-08 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20090616

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69917405 P 20040624

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030626

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990929

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI