Global Patent Index - EP 0992674 A2

EP 0992674 A2 2000-04-12 - Intake manifold

Title (en)

Intake manifold

Title (de)

Einlasskrümmer

Title (fr)

Collecteur d'admission

Publication

EP 0992674 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99810858 A

Priority

CH 203598 A

Abstract (en)

The intake manifold is constructed from two or more shell-shaped parts (10,11), which are inseparably connected to each other. The parts are of metal and are formed sheet metal, cast, and/or extruded parts. The parts are connected by a welded and/or adhesive seam, point welding, rivet or folded seam adhesive seam. Welding is friction or Laser welding, and the adhesive is chemically binding adhesive. The shells are of aluminum or its alloys, or magnesium or its alloys, and are tailored blanks or components formed by internal high pressure forming. They may carry logos or patterns.

Abstract (de)

Einlasskrümmer, wie Ansaugkrümmer, Sammelbehälter, Saugrohre, Schwingungsrohre, Schaltansaugsysteme usw., für Verbrennungsmotoren nach dem Otto- oder Dieselprinzip, wobei der Einlasskrümmer aus zwei oder mehreren miteinander trennfest verbundenen schalenförmigen Teilen aufgebaut ist und die schalenförmigen Teile Blechformteile, Gussformteile und/oder Strangpressprofile aus Metall sind. Das trennfeste Verbinden der schalenförmigen Teile kann z.B. durch Kleben und/oder Schweissen erfolgen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/104

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10 (2006.01); F02M 35/104 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10347 (2013.01); F02M 35/10321 (2013.01); F02M 35/10327 (2013.01); F02M 35/1036 (2013.01); F02M 35/104 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992674 A2 20000412; EP 0992674 A3 20000719; CA 2284758 A1 20000408; US 6321708 B1 20011127

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20030123

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010119

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI