Global Patent Index - EP 0992675 A2

EP 0992675 A2 2000-04-12 - Fuel system

Title (en)

Fuel system

Title (de)

Brennstoffsystem

Title (fr)

Système de carburant

Publication

EP 0992675 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99307975 A

Priority

GB 9821929 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel system comprising a fuel pump (10) having a pumping chamber (18), a spill valve (22) operable to control the timing of fuel pressurization by the pump and a fuel injector (36) comprising a valve needle (38) slidable within a bore. A surface associated with the valve needle (38) is exposed to the fuel pressure within a control chamber (50), and an injection control valve (56) is arranged to control the fuel pressure within the control chamber (50). The injection control valve (56) comprises an electromagnetically actuable valve arranged such that when said actuator (62) thereof is energized, the control chamber (50) is exposed to substantially the fuel pressure within the pumping chamber (18) of the fuel pump (10), de-energization of the actuator (62) of the injection control valve (56) permitting the fuel pressure within the control chamber (50) to fall to a level sufficiently low to allow injection of fuel to occur through the fuel injector (36). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 45/08; F02M 59/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/08 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 45/08 (2013.01); F02M 59/366 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992675 A2 20000412; EP 0992675 A3 20001011; GB 9821929 D0 19981202

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-08-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI