Global Patent Index - EP 0992685 A2

EP 0992685 A2 2000-04-12 - Electronic flow control of a household pump

Title (en)

Electronic flow control of a household pump

Title (de)

Elektronische Durchflussregelung einer Haushaltspumpe

Title (fr)

Régulation électronique du débit d'une pompe ménagère

Publication

EP 0992685 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119759 A

Priority

  • DE 19846047 A
  • DE 19923350 A

Abstract (en)

The pump unit has a pump driven by an electric motor, provided with a pump chamber (8) having at least one pump input (10) and at least one pump output (11) and an integrated pump control for controlling the pump in accordance with a supplied electric, electromagnetic, optical and/or acoustic control signal, e.g. a remote-control signal. An Independent claim for a control device for a domestic pump unit is also included.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Flüssigkeitspumpenanordnung beschrieben, die insbesondere im Haus und/oder Gartenbereich beispielsweise als Pumpe eines Hauswasserwerks verwendbar ist. Sie hat eine Flüssigkeitspumpe mit einer Pumpenkammer (8), in die ein Pumpeneingang (10) hineinführt und aus der ein Pumpenausgang (11) herausführt. Erfindungsgemäß hat die Flüssigkeitspumpenanordnung eine integrierte Steuereinrichtung zur Steuerung der Flüssigkeitspumpe nach Maßgabe mindestens eines Eingangssignals. Als Eingangssignal können beispielsweise Signale pumpeninterner Sensoren wie Pumendrucksensoren oder Durchflußsensoren, oder pumpenexterner Sensoren, z.B. von niederschlags- oder bodenfeuchte Sensoren genutzt werden. Vorzugsweise ist die Steuereinrichtung als von der Flüssigkeitspumpenanordnung abnehmbares und wieder aufsteckbares Steuermodul ausgebildet. Die Steuereinrichtung kann programmierbar sein. Erfindungsgemäße Flüssigkeitspumpenanordnungen sind bequem an unterschiedliche Einsatzbedingungen anpaßbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 17/03 (2006.01); F04B 53/16 (2006.01); F04D 13/06 (2006.01); F04D 15/02 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 17/03 (2013.01); F04B 53/16 (2013.01); F04D 13/06 (2013.01); F04D 15/02 (2013.01); F04D 29/426 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0992685 A2 20000412; EP 0992685 A3 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 53/10 A, 7F 04B 53/20 B, 7F 04D 13/06 B, 7F 04B 17/06 B

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI